This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2018 at 07:08:08 (UTC).

HAMMER v. SORENSEN et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 HAMMER filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against SORENSEN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CHARLES A STAMPELOS and ROBERT L HINKLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00329

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

CHARLES A STAMPELOS

Presiding Judge

ROBERT L HINKLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARION P. HAMMER

MARION P HAMMER

Defendants

HOWARD WEISS

PATRICK SULLIVAN

LAWRENCE T. SORENSEN

CHRISTOPHER RISICA

LAWRENCE T SORENSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHANE BRADY VOGT

Attorney at BAJO CUVA COHEN & TURKEL - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

KENNETH G TURKEL

Attorney at BAJO CUVA COHEN & TURKEL - TAMPA FL

100 N Tampa Street, Suite 1900

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN ETC PC - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 N Monroe St, Ste 925

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CHRISTOPHER RISICA (ckm) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#21

(#21) MOTION for Entry of Default Against Christopher Risica and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

20 #1

Exhibit 1

#20

(#20) MOTION Leave to Conduct Expedited Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

15 #1

Affidavit of Lawrence T. Sorensen

6 #4

Exhibit 4

6 #2

Exhibit 2

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#3

(#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

1 #35

SUMMONS FOR LOL SORENSEN

1 #34

SUMMONS FOR CHRISTOPHER RISICA

1 #33

Exhibit 33

1 #32

Exhibit 32

1 #31

Exhibit 31

1 #30

Exhibit 30

1 #19

Exhibit 19

1 #18

Exhibit 18

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF & DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4229492.), filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 SUMMONS FOR CHRISTOPHER RISICA, #35 SUMMONS FOR LOL SORENSEN) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

113 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to CHRISTOPHER RISICA (ckm) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER DENYING THE MOTION TO DISMISS, AUTHORIZING A DEFAULT, AUTHORIZING DISCOVERY ON MR. WEISS'S IDENTITY, AND DENYING A PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION - Mr. Sorensen's motion to dismiss, ECF No. #15 , is denied. Ms. Hammer's motion for leave to conduct discovery on personal jurisdiction over Mr. Sorensen, ECF No. #20 , is denied as moot. Ms. Hammer's motion for entry of a default, ECF No. #21 , is granted. The clerk must enter a default against Mr. Risica. Ms. Hammer's motion for leave to conduct discovery on identity and citizenship, ECF No. #6 , is granted in part. Ms. Hammer's preliminary-injunction motion, ECF No. #3 , is denied. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/7/2018. (ckm) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) SCHEDULING AND MEDIATION ORDER - re: #23 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery due by 2/25/2019. Dispositive Motions to be filed by 3/18/2019. Mediation Report due by 3/25/2019. Jury Trial set for 5/20/2019 at 8:15 AM in U.S. Courthouse Tallahassee before JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE. Case referred to mediation. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 9/5/2018. (cle) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION Leave to Conduct Expedited Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #21 MOTION for Entry of Default Against Christopher Risica and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Shane B. Vogt filed by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MOTION for Entry of Default Against Christopher Risica and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION Leave to Conduct Expedited Personal Jurisdiction Discovery and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by LAWRENCE T SORENSEN. (FINDLEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) AFFIDAVIT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion of Shane B. Vogt by MARION P HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS MARSHALL FINDLEY on behalf of LAWRENCE T SORENSEN (FINDLEY, THOMAS) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to LAWRENCE T. SORENSEN. (cle) (Entered: 07/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to CHRISTOPHER RISICA. (cle) (Entered: 07/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE OF SIMILAR OR RELATED CASE by MARION P. HAMMER (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Discovery (Leave to Conduct Limited Discovery & Incorporated Memorandum of Law) by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Shane B. Vogt filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law of Marion P. Hammer filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (VERIFIED) FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF & DAMAGES against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4229492.), filed by MARION P. HAMMER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 SUMMONS FOR CHRISTOPHER RISICA, #35 SUMMONS FOR LOL SORENSEN) (VOGT, SHANE) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less