This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2019 at 07:33:53 (UTC).

Halperin v. Moreno et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Halperin filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Moreno. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Colm F. Connolly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01881

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colm F. Connolly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Halperin

Debtor

Green Field Energy Services, Inc.

Defendants

Casafin II, LLC

MOR MGH Holdings, LLC

MOR DOH Holdings, LLC

Aerodynamic, LLC

Turbine Generation Services, LLC

FRAC Rentals, LLC

Michael B. Moreno

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven K. Kortanek

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Patrick A. Jackson

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Joseph N. Argentina, Jr.

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

222 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1410

Wilmington, DE 19801-1621

Defendant Attorney

Marc J. Phillips

Attorney at CKR Law LLP

1000 North West Street, Suite 1200

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Limited Objections

1 #2

Suggestion in Support for Limited Objections

1 #3

Response to Objections

1 #4

Reply Brief in Support of Limited Objections

1 #5

Notice of Completion of Briefing

1 #6

Bankruptcy Court Transmittal

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Added as an attachment, Plaintiff's Surreply dated 11/15/18. (rwc) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketCORRECTING ENTRY: Replaced Notice of Docketing with Corrected Copy (added party). (rwc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketRemark : Case submitted for routine judicial case assignment. (rwc) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Docketing Bankruptcy Proposed Findings of Fact/Conclusion of Law record from case number 13-12783 ; AP 15-50262. (rwc) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/28/2018) (rwc). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - Signed on September 12, 2018 by the Honorable Kevin Gross. (Attachments: #1 Limited Objections, #2 Suggestion in Support for Limited Objections, #3 Response to Objections, #4 Reply Brief in Support of Limited Objections, #5 Notice of Completion of Briefing, #6 Bankruptcy Court Transmittal) (rwc) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2018: #7 Surreply dated 11/15/18) (rwc). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Turbine Generation Services L L C is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A. Jackson Esq.