This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:31 (UTC).

Hall v. Verizon Communications, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Hall filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Verizon Communications, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01080

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Ellis Hall, II

Falls Church, VA 22043

Defendant

Verizon Communications, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Frederick Nieman

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (VA)

10701 Parkridge Blvd, Suite 300

Reston, VA 20191

Tanzeela Ahmad

Attorney at Jackson Lewis PC (Reston)

10701 Parkridge Blvd, Suite 300

Reston, VA 20191

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit 1

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Loudoun County, case number CL 115990 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6242242.), filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(aott, ) Modified on 9/12/2018 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Hearing Date re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Roseboro Notice as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#21

(#21) Opposition to #19 MOTION for order granting for judgment filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

#19

(#19) MOTION for order granting for judgment by James Ellis Hall, II. (klau, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION for order granting for judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, ) Modified on 10/5/2018 to correct filed date (klau, ). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#13

(#14) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION for Order- Granting for Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (aott) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

13 #1

Local Rule 83.1 Certification

#18

(#18) Opposition to #13 MOTION (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Granting Motion for Judgment) filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION for Order granting motion for movement of trial date. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/19/2018. (aott, c/m 9/20/2018 ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#8

(#17) ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION for Order granting motion for movement of trial date. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/19/2018. (aott, c/m 9/20/2018 ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#16

(#16) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2018
  • Per LO chambers motions set for 10/19/18 on the pleadings (clar, ) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Opposition to #19 MOTION for order granting for judgment filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #19 MOTION for order granting for judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, ) Modified on 10/5/2018 to correct filed date (klau, ). (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION for order granting for judgment by James Ellis Hall, II. (klau, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Opposition to #13 MOTION (Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Order Granting Motion for Judgment) filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying as moot #8 MOTION for Order granting motion for movement of trial date. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 9/19/2018. (aott, c/m 9/20/2018 ) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Notice of Hearing Date Amended Notice of Hearing re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #13 MOTION for Order- Granting for Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (aott) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #8 MOTION for Order granting motion for movement of trial date : Motion Hearing set for 9/21/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Order granting motion for movement of trial date by James Ellis Hall, II. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Tanzeela Ahmad on behalf of Verizon Communications, Inc. (Ahmad, Tanzeela) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 10/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 600 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, ) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Roseboro Notice as to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Hearing Date re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. filed by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Dismiss Plantiff's Complaint with Roseboro,. by Verizon Communications, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Nieman, Matthew) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Loudoun County, case number CL 115990 ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6242242.), filed by Verizon Communications, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(aott, ) Modified on 9/12/2018 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ). (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.