This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 07:41:50 (UTC).

Hall v. UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Hall filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Debra McVicker Lynch and Sarah Evans Barker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03068

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Debra McVicker Lynch

Presiding Judge

Sarah Evans Barker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kimberly Hall

Defendant

UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James D. Masur, II

Attorney at ROBERT W. YORK & ASSOCIATES

7212 North Shadeland Avenue, Suite 150

Indianapolis, IN 46250

Defendant Attorneys

Amy Suzanne Wilson

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

Alexandra S. Oxyer

Attorney at FROST BROWN TODD LLC (Indianapolis)

201 North Illinois Street, Suite 1900, P.O. Box 44961

Indianapolis, IN 46244-0961

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER - Acknowledges Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/6/2018. (marginal notation) (CKM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The court has been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/5/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY HALL. (Masur, James) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

9 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) Submission of Additional State Records Marion Superior Court Case Number 49D01-1809-PL- 036201. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2018 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/12/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S. Oxyer on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Amy S. Wilson of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Suzanne Wilson on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A: State Court Record (Complaint and Summons)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D01-1809-PL-036201, filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5095678) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Record (Complaint and Summons), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER - Acknowledges Notice of Dismissal without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Sarah Evans Barker on 11/6/2018. (marginal notation) (CKM) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER Directing Filing of Documents Authorizing Dismissal: The court has been advised that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this case. Therefore, all pending motions, if any, are now DENIED AS MOOT and all previously ordered dates relating to discovery, filings, schedules, conferences, and trial, if any, are VACATED. Within thirty days of the date of this entry, counsel for the plaintiff shall file a motion to dismiss this cause and submit an order for the Court's signature ordering the dismissal of this action or a stipulation of dismissal (consistent with the agreement of the parties). Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 11/5/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal, filed by Plaintiff KIMBERLY HALL. (Masur, James) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Submission of Additional State Records Marion Superior Court Case Number 49D01-1809-PL- 036201. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CKM) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/8/2018 10:30 AM (Eastern Time) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. Read this entire order carefully; it sets out the court's expectations for the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 10/12/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Alexandra S. Oxyer on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Oxyer, Alexandra) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Amy S. Wilson of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Suzanne Wilson on behalf of Defendant UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Marion County Superior Court, case number 49D01-1809-PL-036201, filed by UNITED PARCEL SERVICE, INC.. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5095678) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Record (Complaint and Summons), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Amy) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Parcel Service, Inc. is a litigant