This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:28:55 (UTC).

Hall v. Inmate Services Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Hall filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Inmate Services Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is D. P. Marshall Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00235

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

D. P. Marshall Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christina Hall

Defendants

Inmate Services Corporation

Randy Cagle, Jr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Wesley Burks

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Daniel D. Ford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorney

Ross Emerson Webster

Attorney at Glankler Brown, PLLC

6000 Poplar Avenue, Suite 400

Memphis, TN 38119-3955

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation.(Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#10

(#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/22/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/22/2019. (slb) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Certify Class , For Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Christina Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Electronic Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit 3 - Electronic Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Mail Consent to Join Collective Action, #5 Exhibit 5 - Reminder Postcard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Josh Sanford, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Christina Hall)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Certify Class , For Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#1

(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Christina Hall against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069900. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Hall. Inmate Services Corporation served on 12/12/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Emerson Webster on behalf of Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

6 #3

Exhibit 3 - Electronic Notice

6 #7

Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Christina Hall

6 #4

Exhibit 4 - Proposed Mail Consent to Join Collective Action

#7

(#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Certify Class, for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information filed by Christina Hall. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

6 #6

Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Josh Sanford

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Proposed Notice

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #11 , granted. Response due by 8 February 2019. For good cause, claims of opt-in plaintiffs are equitably tolled for nine days. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/28/2019. (slb) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION to Certify Class , For Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Report due by 2/22/2019. Bench Trial set for 2/10/2020 at 9:30 AM in Jonesboro Courtroom (large) #324 before Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. Signed at the direction of the Court on 1/22/2019. (slb) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation.(Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 Motion to Certify Class, for Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information filed by Christina Hall. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Certify Class , For Approval and Distribution of Notice and for Disclosure of Contact Information by Christina Hall (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Notice, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Electronic Consent to Join, #3 Exhibit 3 - Electronic Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proposed Mail Consent to Join Collective Action, #5 Exhibit 5 - Reminder Postcard, #6 Exhibit 6 - Declaration of Josh Sanford, #7 Exhibit 7 - Declaration of Christina Hall)(Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER: Unopposed motion, No. #4 , granted. Answer or Rule 12(b) motion due by 18 January 2019. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/4/2019. (thd) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ross Emerson Webster on behalf of Randy Cagle, Jr, Inmate Services Corporation (Webster, Ross) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christina Hall. Inmate Services Corporation served on 12/12/2018. (Sanford, Joshua) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT-COLLECTIVE ACTION filed by Christina Hall against All Defendants. Fee $400. Receipt Number LIT069900. Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.