This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/29/2018 at 07:43:09 (UTC).

Halfhide v. Gold Coast USA, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/30/2018 Halfhide filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Gold Coast USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Daniel C. Irick and Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01428

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Daniel C. Irick

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rodney Halfhide

Defendant

Gold Coast USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Robert Twombly

Attorney at White & Twombly, P.A.

9999 Ne 2Nd Ave, Ste. 306

Miami, FL 33138

Manny Menashe Tarich

Attorney at The Tarich Law Firm P.A.

19495 Biscayne Blvd Ste 606

Aventura, FL 33180-2321

Defendant Attorney

Gina M. Cadogan

Attorney at Cadogan Law

Suite 107, 300 S Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) RESPONSE re #8 Order to show cause by Rodney Halfhide. (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#11

(#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #5 Interested persons order by Manny Menashe Tarich on behalf of Rodney Halfhide (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rodney Halfhide. (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel that Case was Removed to Federal Court & Scheduling Order #7 by Gold Coast USA, Inc. (Cadogan, Gina) Modified on 10/9/2018 (SPM). (Entered: 10/08/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/25/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#7

(#7) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 10/15/18 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 12/3/18 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 11/5/2018; Settlement Report due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

#6

(#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Gold Coast USA, Inc..(Cadogan, Gina) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

#5

(#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/4/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#4

(#4) RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/4/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 for Robert Twombly. (A copy was mailed to counsel.) (signed by deputy clerk). (JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT against Gold Coast USA, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Rodney Halfhide. Filed in Brevard County Court on 07/17/18.(JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County 18th Judicial Circuit, case number 05-2018-sc-037062 filed in State Court on 07/17/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL076471 filed by Gold Coast USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE re #8 Order to show cause by Rodney Halfhide. (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) CERTIFICATE of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement re #5 Interested persons order by Manny Menashe Tarich on behalf of Rodney Halfhide (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Rodney Halfhide. (Tarich, Manny) Modified on 10/10/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of filing Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel that Case was Removed to Federal Court & Scheduling Order #7 by Gold Coast USA, Inc. (Cadogan, Gina) Modified on 10/9/2018 (SPM). (Entered: 10/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER for Plaintiff to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed, which may include dismissal of this case, for failure to respond to the Related Case Order and Interested Persons Order. Show Cause Response due by 10/9/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/25/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) FLSA SCHEDULING ORDER. By 10/15/18 parties shall serve copies upon each other as stated in the order; By 12/3/18 parties are to meet and confer; Answer to court interrogatories due by 11/5/2018; Settlement Report due by 12/24/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/24/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #2 Complaint by Gold Coast USA, Inc..(Cadogan, Gina) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/4/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RELATED CASE ORDER (FLSA). Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/4/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 for Robert Twombly. (A copy was mailed to counsel.) (signed by deputy clerk). (JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT against Gold Coast USA, Inc. with Jury Demand filed by Rodney Halfhide. Filed in Brevard County Court on 07/17/18.(JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Brevard County 18th Judicial Circuit, case number 05-2018-sc-037062 filed in State Court on 07/17/18. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ORL076471 filed by Gold Coast USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(JP) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Coast Cab Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gina Marie Cadogan