This case was last updated from PACER on 06/25/2020 at 06:29:01 (UTC).

HAGERMAN v. PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/02/2017 HAGERMAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are LESLIE J ABRAMS and LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LESLIE J ABRAMS

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LINDA HAGERMAN

Defendant

PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CRAIG A WEBSTER

405 Love Ave

Tifton, GA 31794

Defendant Attorneys

NEGIN K PORTIVENT

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

EVELYN ANN FRENCH

1355 Peachtree St Ne Ste 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

ASHLEY C WEBBER

Attorney at Swift, Currie, McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

23 #1

Certificate of Service

#23

(#23) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by LINDA HAGERMAN re #22 Order to Consolidate Case,, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

#21

(#21) REPLY to Response filed by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Def Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Webber, Ashley) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

19 #11

Depo of Jose Martinez

19 #8

Depo of Sean Alexander

19 #7

Depo of Thomas Hall Vol 2

19 #2

Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Jud

19 #1

Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent CATERPILLAR INC, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES HOLDINGS CORP, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION, Other Affiliate AMSTED RPS/SCHWIHAG JV LLC, Other Affiliate CATERPILLAR AMERICAS CO, Other Affiliate HAYNES CORPORATION, Other Affiliate KENTUCKIANA RAILCAR REPAIR & STORAGE FACILITY LLC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL HOLDINGS INC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL INTERNATIONAL CORP, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL RACELAND CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL ROCKLIN CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL SWITCHING SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL WELDING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL WILDWOOD LLC, Other Affiliate S & L RAILROAD LLC, Other Affiliate UNITED INDUSTRIES LLC, Other Affiliate UPTAKE TECHNOLOGIES INC for PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Broach, Ashley) (Entered: 08/25/2017)

#6

(#6) ***FILED CORRECTLY AT #7 *** Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES HOLDINGS CORP for PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Broach, Ashley) Modified on 8/25/2017 (mdm). (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION.(Broach, Ashley)Attorney Ashley Webber Broach added to party PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LINDA HAGERMAN as to PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

#16

(#22) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 1:17-cv-140. Member Case # 1:17-cv147 & 1:18-cv-28. The Parties may file written objections to this Ordersetting forth good cause as to why the cases should not be consolidated within seven days. If no meritorious objections are filed, this Order will take effect on Thursday, April 25, 2019, and Hagerman, 1:17-CV-147 and Hall, 1:18-CV-028 will be administratively closed. The Clerk of the Court further is directed to file this Order in each of the companion cases: Hagerman, 1:17-CV-147 and Hall, 1:18-CV-028. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/18/2019. (bcl) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (mdm) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

#2

(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LINDA HAGERMAN (mdm) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

1 #2

Summons to Progress Rail Services Corporation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2677518, $400 filed by Linda Hagerman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Progress Rail Services Corporation)(WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

47 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE to Court Order filed by LINDA HAGERMAN re #22 Order to Consolidate Case,, (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER TO CONSOLIDATE CASE Lead Case # 1:17-cv-140. Member Case # 1:17-cv147 & 1:18-cv-28. The Parties may file written objections to this Ordersetting forth good cause as to why the cases should not be consolidated within seven days. If no meritorious objections are filed, this Order will take effect on Thursday, April 25, 2019, and Hagerman, 1:17-CV-147 and Hall, 1:18-CV-028 will be administratively closed. The Clerk of the Court further is directed to file this Order in each of the companion cases: Hagerman, 1:17-CV-147 and Hall, 1:18-CV-028. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 4/18/2019. (bcl) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) REPLY to Response filed by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Stmt of Material Facts Resp Def Response to Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Facts)(Webber, Ashley) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE filed by LINDA HAGERMAN re #19 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Stmt of Material Facts Resp to Defendant's statement of facts, #3 Statement of Material Facts in opposition to Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, #4 Affidavit of Sean Alexander with Exhibits, #5 Exhibit Certificate of Need to File Discovery, #6 Exhibit deposition of James Robert Bowman, #7 Exhibit depostion of Dr. William Thompson, #8 Certificate of Service)(WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 12/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Summary Judgment by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION filed by Ashley C Webber. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Summary Judgmnet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A - SEA Report of February 21, 2018, #4 Exhibit B - State of Georgia Traffic Crash Report, #5 Certificate of Need to File Discovery, #6 Depo of Thomas Hall Vol 1, #7 Depo of Thomas Hall Vol 2, #8 Depo of Sean Alexander, #9 Depo of Timothy Spurlock, #10 Depo of Kaylob Stevens, #11 Depo of Jose Martinez)(Webber, Ashley) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #17 CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding the time permitted for Depositions on the issue of Medical Damages. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 10/19/2018. (mdm) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to File regarding the time permitted for Depositions on the issue of Medical Damages. by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION filed by Ashley Webber Broach. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Broach, Ashley) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency (related document(s): #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File filed by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION ); Other: Per page 8 of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Filing, the name of the ECF user under whose login and password the document is submitted must be preceded by s/ in the space where the signature would otherwise appear. The s/ name on the document and the name associated with the participants login ID must be the same. DOCUMENT MUST BE REFILED. (mdm) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Depositions on the Issue of Medical Damages. by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION filed by NEGIN K PORTIVENT. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(PORTIVENT, NEGIN) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Substitution of Counsel by NEGIN K PORTIVENT on behalf of PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION Attorney NEGIN K PORTIVENT added to party PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft) (PORTIVENT, NEGIN) Modified on 7/3/2018 (mdm). (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 10/26/2017. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE J ABRAMS on 9/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by EVELYN ANN FRENCH on behalf of PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION Attorney EVELYN ANN FRENCH added to party PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft) (FRENCH, EVELYN) (Entered: 09/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent CATERPILLAR INC, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES HOLDINGS CORP, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES LLC, Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION, Other Affiliate AMSTED RPS/SCHWIHAG JV LLC, Other Affiliate CATERPILLAR AMERICAS CO, Other Affiliate HAYNES CORPORATION, Other Affiliate KENTUCKIANA RAILCAR REPAIR & STORAGE FACILITY LLC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL HOLDINGS INC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL INTERNATIONAL CORP, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL RACELAND CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL ROCKLIN CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL SWITCHING SERVICES LLC, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL WELDING CORPORATION, Other Affiliate PROGRESS RAIL WILDWOOD LLC, Other Affiliate S & L RAILROAD LLC, Other Affiliate UNITED INDUSTRIES LLC, Other Affiliate UPTAKE TECHNOLOGIES INC for PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Broach, Ashley) (Entered: 08/25/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ***FILED CORRECTLY AT #7 *** Corporate Disclosure Statement by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION identifying Corporate Parent PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES HOLDINGS CORP for PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (Broach, Ashley) Modified on 8/25/2017 (mdm). (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION.(Broach, Ashley)Attorney Ashley Webber Broach added to party PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION(pty:dft) (Entered: 08/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by LINDA HAGERMAN as to PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION. (mdm) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to LINDA HAGERMAN (mdm) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency - Other: All parties must be added using ALL CAPS. (i.e. LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Identifying information such as On behalf ofor in their official capacity must be entered in Party Text. (mdm) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against PROGRESS RAIL SERVICES CORPORATION Fee paid: Receipt # 113G-2677518, $400 filed by Linda Hagerman (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons to Progress Rail Services Corporation)(WEBSTER, CRAIG) (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less