This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 18:32:44 (UTC).

Gustafson v. Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District

Case Summary

On 12/12/2018 Gustafson filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles A. Shaw. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02074

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles A. Shaw

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Scott Gustafson

Defendants

Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District

Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District doing business as Metro doing business as Metro Transit doing business as Metrobus doing business as Metrolink

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jason M Finkes

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JASON M. FINKES, LLC

7542 York Drive, Unit 1E

Clayton, MO 63105

Cyrus C. Dashtaki

Attorney at DASHTAKI LAW FIRM. LLC

5205 Hampton Ave

St. Louis, MO 63109

Defendant Attorneys

Brian C. Hey

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 N. Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

James N. Foster, Jr.

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 N. Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

Rex P. Fennessey

Attorney at MCMAHON BERGER PC

2730 N. Ballas Road, Suite 200

St. Louis, MO 63131-3039

 

Court Documents

#32

(#32) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to remand [Doc. 20] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/29/2019. (MRC) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

#30

(#30) RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER "Joint Statement of the Parties" by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#29

(#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#28

(#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#27

(#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#22

(#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#20

(#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#15

(#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#14

(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#6

(#6) Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Scott Gustafson.(MFG) Modified on 12/13/2018 (MFG). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#5

(#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Scott Gustafson.(MFG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Original Filing Form Original Filing Form

1 #4

Attachment Attachments to Notice Regarding Pending Motions

1 #3

Attachment Notice Regarding Pending Motions

1 #2

Attachment Attachmennts 61 through 82 to State court filings

1 #1

Attachment Attachments 1 through 60 to State Court filings

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, case number 1522-CC11361, with receipt number 0865-6923227, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachments 1 through 60 to State Court filings, #2 Attachment Attachmennts 61 through 82 to State court filings, #3 Attachment Notice Regarding Pending Motions, #4 Attachment Attachments to Notice Regarding Pending Motions, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hey, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to remand [Doc. 20] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/29/2019. (MRC) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Docket Text ORDER re: Doc. #22 , MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Ruling on #20 MOTION to Remand, filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson; ORDERED DENIED. The relief requested by Plaintiff was a two-week extension to file a response in opposition to #14 MOTION to Dismiss. This request is now moot as #14 MOTION to Dismiss is fully and timely briefed. The Court will rule on the pending #20 MOTION to Remand before addressing #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on January 17, 2019.(LL) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER "Joint Statement of the Parties" by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) REPLY to Response to Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Stay re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #15 Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, Missouri filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Fennessey, Rex) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (Dashtaki, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District (Acknowledgement of Receipt Of) Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District Sent To: State Court - Executed (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 01/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Hey, Brian) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jason M. Finkes by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. [Clerk's note: Motion filed in State Court] (MRC) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and in Opposition to Defendant's motion to Reconsider re #7 Defendant's Notice of Additional Authority and Motion to Reconsider its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's second Amended Petition and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (MFG) Modified on 12/14/2018 (CBL). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Plaintiff's Memorandum in Opposition to #7 Defendant's Notice of Additional Authority and Motion to Reconsider its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's second Amended Petition and MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (MFG) Modified on 12/14/2018 (CBL). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and/or for Sanctions by Plaintiff Scott Gustafson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(MFG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Third Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Scott Gustafson.(MFG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Notice of Additional Authority and Motion to Reconsider its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's second Amended Petition and MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (MFG). (Added MOTION for Protective Order on 12/14/2018) (CBL). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Scott Gustafson.(MFG) Modified on 12/13/2018 (MFG). (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Scott Gustafson.(MFG) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for the City of St. Louis, case number 1522-CC11361, with receipt number 0865-6923227, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri-Illinois Metropolitan District. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attachments 1 through 60 to State Court filings, #2 Attachment Attachmennts 61 through 82 to State court filings, #3 Attachment Notice Regarding Pending Motions, #4 Attachment Attachments to Notice Regarding Pending Motions, #5 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hey, Brian) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Bi-State Development Agency of the Missouri Illinois Metropolitan District is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brian C. Hey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Rex P. Fennessey

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James N Foster, Jr