This case was last updated from PACER on 01/04/2019 at 07:29:11 (UTC).

Guo v. Lin

Case Summary

On 11/05/2018 Guo filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against Lin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paige J Gossett and Mary Geiger Lewis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02982

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paige J Gossett

Presiding Judge

Mary Geiger Lewis

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wengui Guo

Defendant

Yudan Lin

West Columbia, SC 29169

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nekki Shutt

Attorney at Burnette Shutt and McDaniel PA

Po Box 1929

Columbia, SC 29202

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wengui Guo re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION for Sanctions (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

35 #1

Proposed Order

#35

(#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION for Sanctions by Wengui Guo. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#30

(#30) MOTION for Sanctions by Yudan Lin. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (lbak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

#28

(#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wengui Guo re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

27 #1

Proposed Order

#27

(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wengui Guo. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

23 #1

Proposed Order and Certificate of Service

#23

(#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wengui Guo. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Nekki Shutt on behalf of Wengui Guo (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#8

(#9) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order to Notify of Address Change and pro se litigant guide placed in U.S. Mail to Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

7 #2

Proposed Order

7 #1

Supporting Documents

#7

(#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise plead on or before January 18, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/16/2018. (kkus, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#4

(#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

#3

(#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

1 #1

State Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-32-03623, filed by Yudan Lin. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300078858) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • (#38) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 37 Docket Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply placed in U.S. Mail to Yudan Lin (bgoo) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/28/2018.(jwhi, ) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wengui Guo re #35 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION for Sanctions (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #30 MOTION for Sanctions by Wengui Guo. Response to Motion due by 1/11/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • (#32) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 29 Docket Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply placed in U.S. Mail to Yudan Lin (bgoo) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MOTION for Sanctions by Yudan Lin. Response to Motion due by 1/3/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (lbak) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 Motion to Dismiss. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 12/20/2018. (kkus, ) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wengui Guo re #27 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Wengui Guo. Response to Motion due by 1/2/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Motions referred to Paige J Gossett.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wengui Guo re #25 Reply to Response to Motion, (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Wengui Guo.(Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Nekki Shutt on behalf of Wengui Guo (Shutt, Nekki) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • (#11) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 10 Docket Text Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer placed in U.S. Mail to Yudan Lin (bgoo) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting for good cause shown #7 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an Answer or otherwise plead on or before January 18, 2019. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/16/2018. (kkus, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #8 Order to Notify of Address Change and pro se litigant guide placed in U.S. Mail to Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER directing plaintiff to notify Clerk in writing of any address changes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Paige J. Gossett on 11/16/2018. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Yudan Lin. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Proposed Order) Motions referred to Paige J. Gossett. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Yudan Lin. (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Lexington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018-CP-32-03623, filed by Yudan Lin. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number SCX300078858) (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents) (bgoo) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.