This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/08/2019 at 07:52:16 (UTC).

Guelde v. USA

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Guelde filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Harry S Mattice, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00208

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Harry S Mattice, Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Terry Lynn Guelde

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Clayton M Whittaker

Attorney at McKoon, Williams, Atchley & Stanley, PLLC

633 Chestnut Street, Suite 1500

Chattanooga, TN 37450

Respondent Attorney

Kyle J Wilson

Attorney at U S Department of Justice (Chattanooga USAO)

1110 Market Street, Suite 515

Chattanooga, TN 37402

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) JUDGMENT ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Terry Lynn Guelde.Entered as a judgment by Clerk of Court, John L. Medearis.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/29/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#11

(#11) Exhibit AND Witness List. Custody of Exhibits: All exhibits returned to the offering party pursuant to LR 43.3(b). Related document: #10 Evidentiary Hearing.(SAC, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#10

(#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/28/2019. (Court Reporter Shannan Andrews) (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/28/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/20/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION to Continue by Terry Lynn Guelde. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

#7

(#7) RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA. (KFB, ) Modified on 3/28/2019, to update filed by USA.(SAC, ). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#6

(#6) TRANSPORT ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde.ORDERED the United States Marshal transport the defendant, Terry Guelde to Chattanooga, Tennessee. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/2018. Order hand delivered to the US Marshal. Modified on 11/15/2018, mailed to Guelde. (Entered: 11/15/2018)Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde.ORDERED counsel will be appointed to represent the defendant. Clayton M. Whittaker appointed. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/2018. Copy of Order sent to CJA clerks in Knoxville.Copy mailed to Guelde. (Entered: 11/15/2018)Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde. United States Attorney is hereby ORDERED to file an answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/14/2018. Order mailed to Guelde. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/14/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. Mailed to Guelde. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Terry Lynn Guelde.(KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) JUDGMENT ORDER re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by Terry Lynn Guelde.Entered as a judgment by Clerk of Court, John L. Medearis.Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 3/29/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Exhibit AND Witness List. Custody of Exhibits: All exhibits returned to the offering party pursuant to LR 43.3(b). Related document: #10 Evidentiary Hearing.(SAC, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr: Evidentiary Hearing held on 3/28/2019. (Court Reporter Shannan Andrews) (SAC, ) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Continue. Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/28/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 2/20/2019. (SAC, ) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Continue by Terry Lynn Guelde. (Whittaker, Clayton) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255) filed by USA. (KFB, ) Modified on 3/28/2019, to update filed by USA.(SAC, ). (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TRANSPORT ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde.ORDERED the United States Marshal transport the defendant, Terry Guelde to Chattanooga, Tennessee. Evidentiary Hearing set for 2/21/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Chattanooga before District Judge Harry S Mattice Jr. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/2018. Order hand delivered to the US Marshal. Modified on 11/15/2018, mailed to Guelde. (Entered: 11/15/2018)Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde.ORDERED counsel will be appointed to represent the defendant. Clayton M. Whittaker appointed. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/2018. Copy of Order sent to CJA clerks in Knoxville.Copy mailed to Guelde. (Entered: 11/15/2018)Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/15/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER as to Terry Lynn Guelde. United States Attorney is hereby ORDERED to file an answer. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/14/2018. Order mailed to Guelde. Signed by District Judge Harry S Mattice, Jr on 11/14/18. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE Regarding Requirement to Notify Court of Change of Address. Mailed to Guelde. (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM in Support re #1 Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255). (KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255), filed by Terry Lynn Guelde.(KFB, ) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clayton M Whittaker