This case was last updated from PACER on 11/26/2018 at 07:56:59 (UTC).

Griffin v. Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2018 Griffin filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02665

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia L. Griffin

Defendant

Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen L. Caldwell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KATHLEEN L. CALDWELL

Lipscomb & Pitts Building, 2670 Union Extended, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Russell W. Jackson

Attorney at FORDHARRISON, LLP

1715 Aaron Brenner Drive, Suite 200

Memphis, TN 38120

Mark E. Stamelos

Attorney at FORDHARRISON, LLP

150 3Rd Avenue South, Suite 2010

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 12/18/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc. (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc..(Jackson, Russell) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

7 #1

Certificate of Consultation

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Proposed Order Submitted by Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Jackson, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2889658), filed by Cynthia L. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons)(Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 12/18/2018 at 3:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark E. Stamelos on behalf of Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc. (Stamelos, Mark) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants **TEXT ORDER ONLY -- NO IMAGE ASSOCIATED**. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/23/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc..(Jackson, Russell) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, and Proposed Order Submitted by Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Consultation)(Jackson, Russell) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Shelby Residential and Vocational Services Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2889658), filed by Cynthia L. Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Summons)(Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less