This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Griffin, Mark v. Waterman, Jolinda et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2018 Griffin, Mark filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Waterman, Jolinda. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00674

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Griffin

Boscobel, WI 53805

Defendants

Scott Rubin-Asch

Jane Doe

Maria Lemieux

John Doe

Mark Kartman

Lt. Tom

Jolinda Waterman

Not Classified By Court

WSPF Prison Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Corey Francis Finkelmeyer

Attorney at Wisconsin Department of Justice

17 W. Main Street, P.O. Box 7857

Madison, WI 53707-7857

Wisconsin Department of Justice_1983 actions

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Bookmarked Exhibits

#1

(#10) Motion to Amend #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mark Griffin. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION to use funds from Release Account to pay filing fee by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#3

(#3) LETTER from the clerk to Mark Griffin re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form, filing fee or petition and trust account statement be filed within 21 days (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#4

(#4) REFUSAL to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

#6

(#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 12/07/2017)

#7

(#7) Order signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/12/2017: ORDERING that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Wisconsin and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Griffin at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)

8 #1

Certification as to three or more dismissals

#15

(#15) Motion to use Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Mark Griffin. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER denying #15 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/7/2018. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#16

(#16) Declaration of Mark Griffin re: #15 Motion to use Release Account Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 2018 Trust Account Statement) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

16 #1

Exhibit A - August 2018 Trust Account Statement

#14

(#14) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#13

(#13) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

13 #1

Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet

#12

(#12) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.91 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#11

(#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Jolinda Waterman, Mark Kartman, Maria Lemieux, Scott Rubin-Asch, Tom, filed by Mark Griffin. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER denying #15 Motion for Use of Release Account Funds Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 9/7/2018. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Declaration of Mark Griffin re: #15 Motion to use Release Account Funds (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - August 2018 Trust Account Statement) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Motion to use Release Account Funds by Plaintiff Mark Griffin. (elc),(ps) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Warden PLRA Letter. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • Initial Partial Filing fee received: $ 1.91, receipt number 34690032644. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Notice from the Clerk regarding the Prisoner E-Filing Program (Attachments: #1 Prisoner E-Filing Information Packet) (elc),(ps) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER on ifp request: Initial partial filing fee of $ 1.91 assessed. Initial partial filing fee due 9/5/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/14/2018. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jane Doe, John Doe, Jolinda Waterman, Mark Kartman, Maria Lemieux, Scott Rubin-Asch, Tom, filed by Mark Griffin. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Motion to Amend #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Mark Griffin. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley. (jef),(ps) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-01632. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (jef) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REQUEST by Mark Griffin for copy of rules regarding civil rights case. (Attachments: #1 Certification as to three or more dismissals)(lh) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Order signed by Judge J.P. Stadtmueller on 12/12/2017: ORDERING that this case be TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Wisconsin and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to take all appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer. (cc: all counsel, via mail to Mark Griffin at Wisconsin Secure Program Facility)(jm) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • Case Reassigned to Judge J P Stadtmueller. Magistrate Judge David E Jones no longer assigned to the case due to non-consent (copy mailed to Plaintiff). (kah) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/14/2018: #1 IPP Calculation) (jef). (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REFUSAL to Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) LETTER from the clerk to Mark Griffin re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge David E Jones and requesting that the consent/refusal form, filing fee or petition and trust account statement be filed within 21 days (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to use funds from Release Account to pay filing fee by Mark Griffin. (mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed against All Defendants by Mark Griffin. (Attachments: #1 Bookmarked Exhibits)(mac) [Transferred from Wisconsin Eastern on 8/14/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.