This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:10 (UTC).

Grey v. Lane

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Grey filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Lane. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip R. Lammens and Wm. Terrell Hodges. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00446

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Philip R. Lammens

Presiding Judge

Wm. Terrell Hodges

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Benjamin Grey

Coleman, FL 33521

Defendant

K. Lane

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to appoint Marshal to serve summons and complaint, titled "Emergency Ex Parte Motion to appoint....." by Benjamin Grey. (LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER dismissing case WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, to terminate any pending motions, and to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 9/18/2018. (CRR) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Writ of possession (claim & delivery) titled "Emergency Ex Parte application...." by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orders)(LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against K. Lane filed by Benjamin Grey. (One service copy provided)(LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

7 #1

Proposed Orders

#9

(#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/29/2018. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MLS) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

10 #1

Attachment

#5

(#5) MOTION to Compel titled "Emergency Motion to compel compliance with request to file documents as written" by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#13

(#13) JUDGMENT entered. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss case by Benjamin Grey. (LAB) Modified on 9/7/2018 (LAB). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

5 #1

Proposed Order

#8

(#8) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Attachement)(LAB) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MLS) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Grey. (LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) JUDGMENT entered. Civil appeals checklist attached. (Signed by Deputy Clerk) (LAB) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER dismissing case WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). The Clerk is directed to enter judgment, to terminate any pending motions, and to close the case. Signed by Senior Judge Wm. Terrell Hodges on 9/18/2018. (CRR) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss case by Benjamin Grey. (LAB) Modified on 9/7/2018 (LAB). (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) STANDING ORDER for all confined, pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 8/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MLS) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 8/29/2018. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff) (MLS) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Attachement)(LAB) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Writ of possession (claim & delivery) titled "Emergency Ex Parte application...." by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Orders)(LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to appoint Marshal to serve summons and complaint, titled "Emergency Ex Parte Motion to appoint....." by Benjamin Grey. (LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Compel titled "Emergency Motion to compel compliance with request to file documents as written" by Benjamin Grey. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to proceed ex parte titled "Emergency Application...." by Benjamin Grey. (LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Personal BOND by Benjamin Grey (LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Benjamin Grey. (LMF) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens. (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against K. Lane filed by Benjamin Grey. (One service copy provided)(LMF) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.