This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:54:46 (UTC).

Gregory v. Raven, et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Gregory filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Raven. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02793

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bryan Gregory

Defendants

Arthur Raven

Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P.

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Steven Marshall

Attorney at REAVES LAW FIRM, PLLC

4466 Elvis Presley Blvd., Ste 310

Memphis, TN 38120

Defendant Attorney

Carl Wyatt

Attorney at GLASSMAN WYATT TUTTLE & COX, P.C.

26 N. Second Street

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#7

(#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, to correct plaintiff's name in paragraph 7. (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/4/19. (jjf) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

1 #2

Summons state court complaint

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arthur Raven.(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

1 #3

Summons state court summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#19

(#19) NOTICE by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P. Filing Discovery Responses (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Bryan Gregory (Chen, Lan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#11

(#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P., Arthur Raven of Service of Discovery (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#15

(#15) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 1/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 12/13/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P. from Circuit Court Shelby County, case number CT-004643-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925555), filed by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons state court complaint, #3 Summons state court summons)(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Arthur Raven (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 1/2/2019 at 2:30 PM is advanced in time only to 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#8

(#8) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/2/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P..(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P. Filing Discovery Responses (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 1/4/19. (jjf) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P., Arthur Raven of Service of Discovery (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE by Bryan Gregory (Chen, Lan) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 1/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 PM on 12/13/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • (#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 1/2/2019. Lan Chen and Kim Shields appeared for the Plaintiff. Carl Wyatt appeared for the Defendants. Kim Shields will file a notice of appearance. Jury Trial set for Monday, 1/6/2020 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial estimated to last 3-4 days. Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 12/20/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4:30 on 12/13/2019. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Arthur Raven.(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Carl Wyatt on behalf of Arthur Raven (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Telephone Scheduling Conference set for Wednesday, 1/2/2019 at 2:30 PM is advanced in time only to 2:00 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P..(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SETTING LETTER: Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Wednesday, 1/2/2019 at 2:30 PM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED DOCUMENT by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P.. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, to correct plaintiff's name in paragraph 7. (Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#6) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COURTESY NOTICE: Pursuant to Rule 5 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, document #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P. has been filed. For future reference, please note : Filer did not add Bryan Gregory as the plaintiff, nor was Arthur Raven added as a defendant. Please note the style of the case is Gregory v. Raven, et al. Demand amounts should be left blank on the docket sheet. Please refer to the #ECF User Manual and #ECF Policies and Procedures. Filer is not required to resubmit document. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P. from Circuit Court Shelby County, case number CT-004643-18 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2925555), filed by Andrews Logistics Texas, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons state court complaint, #3 Summons state court summons)(Wyatt, Carl) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.