This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2019 at 07:57:43 (UTC).

Greenwade v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Greenwade filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kelly Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00119

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kelly Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gwendolyn N. Greenwade

Gwendolyn N Greenwade

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy N Tripp

Attorney at Tripp, P.C.

810 Washington Street, **Ecf

Pella, IA 50219

Frederick J Daley, Jr

Attorney at Daley Disability Law PC

4256 N Ravenswood Avenue, Suite 104, ***Ecf

Chicago, IL 60613

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick J. Daley Jr., on behalf of Plaintiff Gwendolyn N Greenwade. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/30/2018. (src) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/19/2018. (src) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick J. Daley Jr., on behalf of Plaintiff Gwendolyn N Greenwade. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/30/2018. (src) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Frederick J. Daley, Jr. ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2820907) by Plaintiff Gwendolyn N Greenwade (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Daley, Frederick) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 New Social Security Packet) (src) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Gwendolyn N. Greenwade. Dismissal Deadline 3/2/2019. Filed by Clerk per order at #3 . (src) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk is ordered to file the complaint and issue a summons. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney on 11/19/2018. (src) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Check Status Deadline due by 12/19/2018. (pac) (Main Document 2 replaced on 11/20/2018 to correct spelling of Plaintiff's last name) (pac). (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly Mahoney added (conflicts list reviewed; none found: Attorney admission check performed for attorney Timothy N Tripp) (pac) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Gwendolyn N. Greenwade (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tripp, Timothy) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.