This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2019 at 07:08:02 (UTC).

GREEN v. FIVEASH et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2018 GREEN filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against FIVEASH. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and CHARLES J KAHN, JR. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02393

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

CHARLES J KAHN, JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHERYL GREEN

Defendants

HKD PROPERTIES INC

MALINDA FIVEASH

HILL-KELLY DODGE INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

BARRY RICHARD

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 E College Ave, Po Drawer 1838

Tallahassee, FL 32302-1838

FRED F HARRIS, JR

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 E College Ave, Po Drawer 1838

Tallahassee, FL 32302-1838

MICHAEL HOWARD MOODY

Attorney at GREENBERG TRAURIG PA - TALLAHASSEE FL

101 E College Ave, Po Drawer 1838

Tallahassee, FL 32302-1838

Defendant Attorneys

TODD M LADOUCEUR

Attorney at GALLOWAY JOHNSON TOMPKINS ETC - PENSACOLA FL

118 E Garden St

Pensacola, FL 32502

KATHRYN I KASPER

Attorney at SIROTE & PERMUTT PC - PENSACOLA

1115 E Gonzalez St

Pensacola, FL 32503

THOMAS JULIAN MOTES

Attorney at SIROTE & PERMUTT PC - MOBILE AL

Po Box 2025, One St Louis Centre, Suite 1000

Mobile, AL 36633

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by CHERYL GREEN. (MOODY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#15

(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HILL-KELLY DODGE INC. (MOTES, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION for More Definite Statement by MALINDA FIVEASH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/7/2019). (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#11

(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 7/24/2019.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/24/2019. (alb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HILL-KELLY DODGE INC. (MOTES, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

8 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#7

(#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by MALINDA FIVEASH. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

5 #2

Summons HKD Properties

5 #1

Summons Hill Kelly Dodge Inc

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to MALINDA FIVEASH, HILL-KELLY DODGE INC, HKD PROPERTIES INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hill Kelly Dodge Inc, #2 Summons HKD Properties) (alb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to HKD Properties Inc by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Hill-Kelly Dodge Inc by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Malinda Fiveash by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add name (alb). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #16 Response to Motion, #12 MOTION for More Definite Statement and #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (alb) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #12 MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by CHERYL GREEN. (MOODY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by HILL-KELLY DODGE INC. (MOTES, THOMAS) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines/Hearings re #13 MOTION TO DISMISS (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/7/2019). (alb) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for More Definite Statement by MALINDA FIVEASH. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 2/7/2019). (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER :Fed.R.Civ.P. 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/7/2019. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/11/2019. Discovery due by 7/24/2019.. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/24/2019. (alb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #10 Answer to Complaint. (See proposed ISO.) (alb) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by HILL-KELLY DODGE INC. (MOTES, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of T. Julian Motes on behalf of Defendant Hill-Kelly Dodge, Inc. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 1/14/2019. (djb) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Julian Motes. (djb) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by T. Julian Motes.( Filing fee $ 201 receipt number AFLNDC-4375239.) by HILL-KELLY DODGE INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (MOTES, THOMAS) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by MALINDA FIVEASH. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed Acknowledgment filed by HKD PROPERTIES INC. (LADOUCEUR, TODD) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to MALINDA FIVEASH, HILL-KELLY DODGE INC, HKD PROPERTIES INC. (Attachments: #1 Summons Hill Kelly Dodge Inc, #2 Summons HKD Properties) (alb) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to HKD Properties Inc by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Hill-Kelly Dodge Inc by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE Summons to be Issued to Malinda Fiveash by CHERYL GREEN re #1 Complaint (RICHARD, BARRY) Modified on 12/21/2018 to add name (alb). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4362991.), filed by CHERYL GREEN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (RICHARD, BARRY) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/20/2018) (mjm). (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less