This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2018 at 08:10:49 (UTC).

Green v. Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2018 Green filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Curtis. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr, G. R. Smith and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00229

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albertha Green

Garden City, GA 31408

Defendants

Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc.

Dr. Laquita Holt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Otto Woelke Leithart

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office - Savannah

P.O. Box 8970, 22 Barnard Street, Suite 300

Savannah, GA 31401

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RESPONSE to #3 Notice (Other) filed by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. (Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

6 #1

Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A

#6

(#6) MOTION to Substitute Party by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

4 #3

Exh. C - Certification of Employment

4 #2

Exh. B - Declaration of Meredith Torres

4 #1

Exh. A - Chatham County Magistrate Court Record

#4

(#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Chatham County Magistrate Court Record, #2 Exh. B - Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Exh. C - Certification of Employment)(Leithart, Otto) Modified on 9/27/2018 (evs). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal. (jrb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

2 #1

Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights

#2

(#2) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Certificate of Employment

1 #2

Declaration of Meredith Torres

1 #1

Chatham County Magistrate Court Record

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. from Magistrate Court of Chatham County, case number MGCV18-07574., filed by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Chatham County Magistrate Court Record with Defendants' Answer, #2 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Certificate of Employment)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jrb). Modified on 9/26/2018 (jrb). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Motions No Longer Referred: #6 MOTION to Substitute Party. (evs) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (wwp) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #6 MOTION to Substitute Party. (jrb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RESPONSE to #3 Notice (Other) filed by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. (Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Substitute Party by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Responses due by 10/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Leithart, Otto) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) **ENTERED IN ERROR***(evs). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AMENDED DOCUMENT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc., Laquita Holt. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exh. A - Chatham County Magistrate Court Record, #2 Exh. B - Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Exh. C - Certification of Employment)(Leithart, Otto) Modified on 9/27/2018 (evs). (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. answer due 10/1/2018; Laquita Holt answer due 10/1/2018. (jrb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to All Counsel of Record of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal. (jrb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/25/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Litigants' Bill of Rights) (jrb) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. from Magistrate Court of Chatham County, case number MGCV18-07574., filed by Laquita Holt, Curtis V. Cooper Primary Health Center, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Chatham County Magistrate Court Record with Defendants' Answer, #2 Declaration of Meredith Torres, #3 Certificate of Employment)(jrb) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2018: #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jrb). Modified on 9/26/2018 (jrb). (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less