This case was last updated from PACER on 02/17/2018 at 07:09:32 (UTC).

Green v. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company et al

Case Summary

On 02/16/2018 Green filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00131

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ethel Green

Defendants

Bristol-Myers Squibb Company

AstraZeneca Pharmaceuticals LP

McKesson Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Randi Alyson Kassan

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Douglas H. Sanders

100 Garden City Plaza, Suite 500

Garden City, NY 11530

Timothy Michael Clark

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

2860 Michelle Drive, Suite 220

Irvine, CA 92807

Defendant Attorney

Robert K. Woo, Jr.

Attorney at King & Spalding - Atlanta

1180 Peachtree Street N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309-3521

 

Court Documents

24 #1

*Restricted*

#24

(#24) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 1:17-cv-04342. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/16/2018)

#23

(#23) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-1 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing transfer of this action to the Eastern District of Kentucky. (MDL #2809). (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

22 #1

Attachment A

#22

(#22) ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#21

(#21) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

#20

(#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLAIMS OF PRIVILEGE AND PRIVILEGE LOGS (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

17 #3

Exhibit C - Proposed Order regarding Procedures for Electronically Stored Inform

17 #2

Exhibit B - Proposed Stipulation and Order re Claims of Privilege and Privilege

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. Discovery ends on 4/26/2018.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Ethel Green. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Ethel Green. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)

#5

(#5) Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

#4

(#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2018
  • REMARK: Counsel shall refer to #www.kyed.uscourts.gov/518-md-02809-kkc for review of Orders relative to filing procedures in MDL 2809. If you are not registered as an ECF Filing User, please complete the ECF Registration Form and return it to the Clerk within twenty-one (21) days. cc: Order Regarding Practice & Procedure upon Transfer filed February 9, 2018 served via U.S. Mail to counsel not registered as ECF Filing Users. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Northern. Case number 1:17-cv-04342. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received electronically. cc COR w/ copy of docket sheet to non-registered filers (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Case ELECTRONICALLY transferred to the Eastern District of Kentucky. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • Civil Case Terminated. (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER CTO-1 from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation directing transfer of this action to the Eastern District of Kentucky. (MDL #2809). (dgr) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 02/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER REGARDING PROCEDURES FOR ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CLAIMS OF PRIVILEGE AND PRIVILEGE LOGS (See Order for specifics). Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SCHEDULING ORDER approving the #17 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 3/14/2019. Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 01/09/2018. (rsg) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP identifying Corporate Parent AstraZeneca plc, Other Affiliate AstraZeneca AB, Other Affiliate Zeneca, Inc. for Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP.(Woo, Robert) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. Discovery ends on 4/26/2018.(Woo, Robert) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Return of Service Executed by Ethel Green. Bristol-Myers Squibb Company served on 11/15/2017, answer due 12/6/2017. (Kassan, Randi) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service Executed by Ethel Green. Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP served on 11/6/2017, answer due 11/27/2017. (Sanders, Douglas) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Court Notice of Filing: Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation by Judge Richard W. Story. (sk) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to McKesson Corporation. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Astrazeneca Pharmaceuticals, LP. (jkl) [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Ethel Green. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113E-7480206.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jkl) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. [Transferred from gand on 2/16/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less