Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:33:49 (UTC).

Green et al v. The 3M Company, et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Green filed a Property - Real Property Product Liability lawsuit against The 3M Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard M Gergel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03335

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Real Property Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Isaac Green

Jason Robinson

Stacy Green

Aaron Green

Jerome Liggon

Mark Green

Michelle Bloxon

Theodora Liggon

Al Green

Gregory Liggon

Anthony Green

Elizabeth Liggon

Yvonne Green

Defendants

County of Suffolk

Chemguard

National Foam

Tyco Fire Products LP

Buckeye Fire Protection Co.

Angus Fire

The 3M Company

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Hunter Jay Shkolnik

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

360 Lexington Avenue, 11Th. Floor

New York, NY 10017

Scott D. Middleton

Attorney at Campolo, Middleton & McCormick, LLP

4175 Veterans Memorial Highway, Suite 400

Ronkonkoma, NY 11779

Tate J Kunkle

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

400 Broadhollow Road, Suite 305

Mellville, NY 11747

Frederick Eisenbud

Attorney at Campolo, Middleton & McCormick, LLP

4175 Veterans Memorial Highway, Suite 400

Ronkonkoma, NY 11779

Paul J. Napoli

Attorney at Napoli Shkolnik PLLC

1301 Avenue Of The Americas, 10Th Floor

New York, NY 10019

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Scott Kazin

Attorney at Stagg, Terenzi, Confusione & Wabnik LLP

401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

Brian A. Lacoff

Attorney at Stagg, Terenzi, Confusione & Wabnik, LLP

401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

David R. Ehrlich

Attorney at Stagg Terenzi Confusione & Wabnik, LLP

401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

Thomas Edward Stagg

Attorney at Stagg, Terenzi, Confusione & Wabnik, LLP

401 Franklin Avenue, Suite 300

Garden City, NY 11530

David S Weinraub

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Sheila L Birnbaum

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Mark Steven Cheffo

Attorney at Dechert LLP

Three Bryant Park, 1095 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Douglas E Fleming, III

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart and Sullivan

51 Madison Avenue, 22Nd Floor

New York, NY 10010

Ellen N. Corbo

Attorney at Taylor Colicchio LLP

100 Canal Pointe Blvd, Suite 210

Princeton, NJ 08540

Philip M. Colicchio

Attorney at Taylor Colicchio LLP

100 Canal Pointe Blvd, Suite 210

Princeton, NJ 08540

Michael Carpenter

516 South New Hope Road

Gastonia, NC 28054

Andrew Jonathan Calica

Attorney at Mayer Brown

1675 Broadway

New York, NY 10019

Richard F. Bulger

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Michael A. Olsen

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

71 S Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60606

Jordan David Sagalowsky

Attorney at Mayer Brown LLP

1221 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

4 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

102 #1

*Restricted*

#102

(#102) Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-02566. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#24

(#104) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#101

(#101) Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#100

(#100) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: AQUEOUS FILM-FORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that transfer of the actions listed on Schedule B is denied. Signed by Lewis A. Kaplan, Acting Chair JPMDL. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#99

(#99) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#98

(#98) ORDER granting #92 Motion to Stay; The Moving Defendants are directed to file a status report within seven days of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the Motion for Transfer. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/15/2018. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)

92 #1

Memorandum in Support

#92

(#97) RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 Notice of MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until after a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motions for Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.) from Supreme Court of New York for Suffolk County, case number 605497/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9488805) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stephanie, Gase) Modified on 5/1/2017 (Landow, Concetta). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/28/2017)

211 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#104) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. This Order Relates to All Actions. Please see Order for all Details regarding Pretrial Consolidation, Filing, Counsel, Initial Status Conference, and Other Matters. An initial status conference will be held in this matter on February 25, 2019 at 10 A.M. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 1/2/2019. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • (#103) MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern, 2:17-cv-02566, Green et al v. The 3M Company, et al, as DSC case 2:18-cv-03335-RMG. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 2:18-mn-2873-RMG (LEAD case) has been opened as the master docket assigned to Judge Richard M. Gergel, District of South Carolina. This civil action is now associated as a member case. Counsel will be notified re Case Management Orders and other documents posted in the lead case. See Docket for further entries. (sshe, ) (Entered: 12/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 2:17-cv-02566. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent electronically. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) Certified JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order IN RE: AQUEOUS FILM-FORMING FOAMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that transfer of the actions listed on Schedule B is denied. Signed by Lewis A. Kaplan, Acting Chair JPMDL. (Ortiz, Grisel) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the actions listed on Schedule A are transferred to the District of South Carolina and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. (Florio, Lisa) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) ORDER granting #92 Motion to Stay; The Moving Defendants are directed to file a status report within seven days of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's resolution of the Motion for Transfer. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 10/15/2018. C/ECF (Valle, Christine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 Notice of MOTION to Stay All Proceedings Until after a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Pending Motions for Transfer filed by All Plaintiffs. (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
108 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Hunter Jay Shkolnik on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Shkolnik, Hunter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Keith Edward Smith on behalf of National Foam (aty to be noticed) (Smith, Keith) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/03/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas E. Fleming on behalf of Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Douglas) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Steven Cheffo on behalf of Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Cheffo, Mark) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila Birnbaum on behalf of Chemguard, Tyco Fire Products L.P. (aty to be noticed) (Birnbaum, Sheila) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tate J Kunkle on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Kunkle, Tate) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • Case Assigned to Judge Joanna Seybert and Magistrate Judge Anne Y. Shields. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (Landow, Concetta) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing Co.) from Supreme Court of New York for Suffolk County, case number 605497/2017. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9488805) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Stephanie, Gase) Modified on 5/1/2017 (Landow, Concetta). [Transferred from New York Eastern on 12/12/2018.] (Entered: 04/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where National Foam Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Chemguard is a litigant

Latest cases where Buckeye Fire Protection Company is a litigant