This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2019 at 07:29:05 (UTC).

Green Bay Packaging Inc

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 Green Bay Packaging Inc was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green Bay Packaging Inc

Defendant

SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Richard L. Rose

Attorney at Mahaffey & Gore P.C.

300 Northeast First Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

J. Matt Hill

Attorney at Mahaffey & Gore P.C.

300 Northeast First Street

Oklahoma City, OK 73104

Joshua C. Ashley

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Martin Swann

Attorney at Perkins Peiserich Greathouse Morgan Rankin

Post Office Box 251618

Little Rock, AR 72225-1618

G. Alan Perkins

Attorney at Perkins Peiserich Greathouse Morgan Rankin

Post Office Box 251618

Little Rock, AR 72225-1618

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Alan Perkins on behalf of SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Perkins, G.) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC, filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 12/5/2018 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit 2 - Summons

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC served on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons)(Ashley, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Matt Hill. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

9 #1

Exhibit 1

6 #1

Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt

#9

(#9) STIPULATION that the deadline for SEECO to file its Answer or other responsive pleading shall be February 4, 2019 by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perkins, G.) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #3 J. Matt's motion to appear pro hac vice because he meets the requirements of Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard L. Rose. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Martin Swann on behalf of SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Swann, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #2 Richard L. Rose's motion to appear pro hac vice because he meets the requirements of Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION that the deadline for SEECO to file its Answer or other responsive pleading shall be February 4, 2019 by SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Perkins, G.) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Martin Swann on behalf of SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Swann, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by G. Alan Perkins on behalf of SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC (Perkins, G.) (Entered: 01/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC served on 12/10/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Return Receipt, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons)(Ashley, Joshua) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #2 Richard L. Rose's motion to appear pro hac vice because he meets the requirements of Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #3 J. Matt's motion to appear pro hac vice because he meets the requirements of Local Rule 83.5. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/7/2018. (kdr) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include a reference to the Jury Demand. (thd) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by J. Matt Hill. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Richard L. Rose. Fee of $100 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. (kdr) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against SWN Production (Arkansas) LLC, filed by Green Bay Packaging Inc. Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT069894. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Docket text modified on 12/5/2018 to include a reference to the Jury Demand.) (thd). (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.