This case was last updated from PACER on 10/02/2018 at 07:31:00 (UTC).

Great Western ARCJ, LLC v. Kohanfieh

Case Summary

On 08/03/2018 Great Western ARCJ, LLC filed a Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery lawsuit against Kohanfieh. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Preston Deavers and George C. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00754

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Government Benefit Recovery

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

Presiding Judge

George C. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Great Western ARCJ, LLC

Defendant

Mehran Kohanfieh

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Eric Jay Wittenberg

250 East Broad Street, Suite 1725

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC., REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) ***See doc #3 for summons request and doc #5 for cover sheet- Modified entry on 8/22/2018 (er). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Mehran Kohanfieh. (sem) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

2 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6545040), filed by Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#9

(#9) First Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Kohanfieh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Kohanfieh by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

9 #1

Exhibit A

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Mr. Kim on 08/10/2018, filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

9 #2

Exhibit B

#8

(#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN 14 DAYS unless he has applied for an entry for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 4, 2018. (jlk) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#5

(#2) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC., REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) ***See doc #3 for summons request and doc #5 for cover sheet- Modified entry on 8/22/2018 (er). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

(#2) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC., REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) ***See doc #3 for summons request and doc #5 for cover sheet- Modified entry on 8/22/2018 (er). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant Kohanfieh by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Mehran Kohanfieh. (er) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) First Application to Clerk for entry of default against Defendant Kohanfieh. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN 14 DAYS unless he has applied for an entry for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Response due by 9/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 4, 2018. (jlk) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS Returned Executed: Mehran Kohanfieh served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. ***See entry #7 for document. (er) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint served on Mr. Kim on 08/10/2018, filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Mehran Kohanfieh. (sem) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (Wittenberg, Eric) Modified text on 8/13/2018 (er). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint Acknowledgment filed by Plaintiff Great Western ARCJ, LLC., REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) ***See doc #3 for summons request and doc #5 for cover sheet- Modified entry on 8/22/2018 (er). (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6545040), filed by Great Western ARCJ, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Wittenberg, Eric) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.