This case was last updated from PACER on 10/12/2018 at 07:37:07 (UTC).

Graphic Communication Union v. Our Sunday Visitor Inc

Case Summary

On 08/13/2018 Graphic Communication Union filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Our Sunday Visitor Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul R Cherry and Theresa L Springmann. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00253

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Paul R Cherry

Presiding Judge

Theresa L Springmann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Local 17-M Graphic Communications Union

Defendant

Our Sunday Visitor Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William R Groth

Attorney at Fillenwarth Dennerline Groth & Towe LLP

429 E Vermont St Ste 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

David T Vlink

Attorney at Fillenwarth Dennerline Groth & Towe LLP

429 E Vermont St Ste 200

Indianapolis, IN 46202

Defendant Attorney

Shane C Mulholland

Attorney at Burt Blee Dixon Sutton & Bloom LLP

200 E Main St Ste 1000

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) MOTION to Continue - Unopposed Motion to Continue Telephonic Status Conference by Defendant Our Sunday Visitor Inc. (Mulholland, Shane) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

34 #1

*Restricted*

#34

(#34) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/13/2018)

#33

(#33) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 8/10/18. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#32

(#32) CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana. OSV's Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. #11 ) is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/10/2018.(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#31

(#31) REPLY in Support of Motion re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#27

(#29) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2018)

#21

(#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment #21 , filed by Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Groth, William) Modified on 6/11/2018 - added link to MSJ at #21 (NAD). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/08/2018)

#11

(#32) CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana. OSV's Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. #11 ) is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/10/2018.(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Vlink on behalf of Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Vlink, David) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Groth, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

1 #5

Proposed Summons

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Envelope C - 9/18/17 email chain

1 #2

Exhibit B - Opinion and Award of Arbitrator Brookins

1 #1

Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT to Enforce Arbitration Award against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4693129) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Opinion and Award of Arbitrator Brookins, #3 Envelope C - 9/18/17 email chain, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/26/2018 before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Pla appeared by atty David Vlink. Dft appeared by atty Shane Mulholland. Counsel advise the #21 Motion for Summary Judgment and #27 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment are fully briefed and parties are not currently engaged in discovery. Court grants Counsel's request to stay discovery pending ruling on motions. Stay on discovery will be automatically lifted after ruling on motions, if necessary. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) MINUTE ORDER granting #36 Unopposed Motion to Continue Telephonic Status Conference. The Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 9/26/2018 at 2:00 pm. Court to initiate call. Text entry order. By Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry on 9/19/2018. (mr) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) MOTION to Continue - Unopposed Motion to Continue Telephonic Status Conference by Defendant Our Sunday Visitor Inc. (Mulholland, Shane) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • (#35) NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2018 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Paul R Cherry. Court to initiate call. (mr) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) Case transferred in from District of Indiana Southern; Case Number 1:18-cv-00011. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Indiana. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Indiana, on 8/10/18. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) CLOSED TRANSFER to Northern District of Indiana. OSV's Motion to Transfer Venue (Filing No. #11 ) is GRANTED, and this case shall be transferred to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. The Clerk is directed to transfer this matter to the Northern District of Indiana, Fort Wayne Division. Signed by Judge Tanya Walton Pratt on 8/10/2018.(NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) REPLY in Support of Motion re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) RESPONSE in Opposition re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Reply in Support of its Motion for Summary Judgment #21 , filed by Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Groth, William) Modified on 6/11/2018 - added link to MSJ at #21 (NAD). [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 06/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support re #27 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 05/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER- Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2018 at 10:00 AM (Eastern) in room #277, United States Courthouse, 46 E. Ohio Street, Indianapolis, Indiana before Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch. No fewer than seven days before the IPTC, counsel must file a proposed CMP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra McVicker Lynch on 1/16/2018.(CBU) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C. Mulholland on behalf of Defendant OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (Mulholland, Shane) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) RETURN of Service by CMRRR, filed by All Plaintiffs. OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC. served on 1/8/2018. (Vlink, David) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (HET) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to OUR SUNDAY VISITOR, INC.. (NAD) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by David T. Vlink on behalf of Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Vlink, David) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by William R. Groth on behalf of Plaintiff GRAPHIC COMMUNICATIONS UNION, LOCAL 17-M. (Groth, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT to Enforce Arbitration Award against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-4693129) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Collective Bargaining Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Opinion and Award of Arbitrator Brookins, #3 Envelope C - 9/18/17 email chain, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Groth, William) [Transferred from Indiana Southern on 8/13/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less