This case was last updated from PACER on 04/10/2018 at 05:39:18 (UTC).

Grant v. Office of the Illinois Governor

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 Grant filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Office of the Illinois Governor. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03073

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Lee Grant, II

Springfield, IL 62702

Defendants

U.S. Department of Justice

Richard Abel Kabaker

State of Illinois

Office of the Illinois Governor

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) JUDGMENT entered. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

14 #1

*Restricted*

#14

(#14) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00829. . (Entered: 04/09/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER: The Court is of the opinion that Plaintiff's #11 objection should be OVERRULED and that this case should be transferred to the Central District of Illinois for the reasons previously stated by the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/9/2018) (sss) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

12 #2

Affidavit(s)

12 #1

Exhibit(s)

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Affidavit(s)) (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/07/2018)

#11

(#11) OBJECTION filed by William Lee Grant, II re: #10 Order Transferring to Another District, (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action will be transferred to the Central District of Illinois on April 26, 2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Cummings within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. If an objection is filed, the order of transfer is stayed pending further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/5/2018) (rekc) Modified on 4/6/2018 (mcrd). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#9

(#9) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Grant, William) Modified text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

8 #1

Exhibit(s) U.S. EEOC Complaint Spreadsheet

#8

(#8) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) U.S. EEOC Complaint Spreadsheet) (Grant, William) Modified text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#7

(#7) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Grant, William) Modified docket text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#6

(#6) Appendix in Support filed by William Lee Grant, II re #3 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, (Grant, William) Modified docket text on 4/6/2018 (ajb). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by William Lee Grant, II. Clerk to issue summons(es) for new federal defendant(s). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lee Grant, II. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT against Office of the Illinois Governor filed by William Lee Grant, II. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) JUDGMENT entered. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colin Stirling Bruce on 4/9/2018. On April 4, 2018, Plaintiff, William Lee Grant, II, filed a pro se Civil Rights Complaint #3 and a Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #4 in the Northern District of Texas. The next day, he filed an Amended Complaint #5 with an appendix and exhibits [6, 7, 8, 9]. On April 9, 2018, the case was transferred in to the Central District of Illinois. This court has thoroughly reviewed Plaintiff's complaint, as mandated by 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(e)(2). After its review, this court concludes that Plaintiff's complaint is frivolous and fails to state a claim on which relief may be granted. Not surprisingly, Plaintiff's newest complaint raises irrational and wholly incredible issues which have all been previously dismissed by this court. See, e.g., case numbers: 16-CV-3132, 16-CV-3239, 16- CV-3245, 17-CV-3188, 17-CV-3203, 17-CV-3206, 17-CV-3207, 17-CV-3215, 17-CV-3274, 17-CV-3257, 17-CV-3261, 18-CV-3054. This court views the latest complaint as a continuation of Plaintiff's abuse of the pro se civil litigation process. For all of the reasons stated in this order and this court's numerous prior orders '(see non-exhaustive list above), Plaintiff's Amended Complaint #5 is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis #4 is DENIED as moot. This case is terminated. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Case transferred in from District of Texas Northern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00829. . (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: The Court is of the opinion that Plaintiff's #11 objection should be OVERRULED and that this case should be transferred to the Central District of Illinois for the reasons previously stated by the Magistrate Judge. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 4/9/2018) (sss) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL as to #10 Order Transferring Case, to the Fifth Circuit by William Lee Grant, II (see document #12 for image). T.O. form to appellant electronically at #Transcript Order Form or US Mail as appropriate. Copy of NOA to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. IMPORTANT ACTION REQUIRED: Provide an electronic copy of any exhibit you offered during a hearing or trial that was admitted into evidence to the clerk of the district court within 14 days of the date of this notice. Copies must be transmitted as PDF attachments through ECF by all ECF Users or delivered to the clerk on a CD by all non-ECF Users. See detailed instructions #here. (Exception: This requirement does not apply to a pro se prisoner litigant.) Please note that if original exhibits are in your possession, you must maintain them through final disposition of the case. (zkc) (Entered: 04/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave to Appeal filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Affidavit(s)) (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) OBJECTION filed by William Lee Grant, II re: #10 Order Transferring to Another District, (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: This action will be transferred to the Central District of Illinois on April 26, 2018, to allow any party to file an objection to Judge Cummings within 14 days after being served with a copy of this order. If an objection is filed, the order of transfer is stayed pending further order of the Court. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge David L. Horan on 4/5/2018) (rekc) Modified on 4/6/2018 (mcrd). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Grant, William) Modified text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) U.S. EEOC Complaint Spreadsheet) (Grant, William) Modified text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Exhibits in Support of #5 Amended Complaint, filed by William Lee Grant, II. (Grant, William) Modified docket text per filer's request on 4/5/2018 (ran). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Appendix in Support filed by William Lee Grant, II re #3 Complaint, #5 Amended Complaint, (Grant, William) Modified docket text on 4/6/2018 (ajb). (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by William Lee Grant, II. Clerk to issue summons(es) for new federal defendant(s). Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Grant, William) (Entered: 04/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • ***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No: 1, 2. Wed Apr 4 16:06:20 CDT 2018 (crt) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by William Lee Grant, II. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against Office of the Illinois Governor filed by William Lee Grant, II. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. CASREF case referral set and case referred to Magistrate Judge Horan (see Special Order 3). Initiating documents received by mail. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (zkc) (Entered: 04/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less