This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/30/2018 at 07:32:40 (UTC).

Granite Re, Inc. v. Blue Earth County

Case Summary

On 08/31/2018 Granite Re, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Blue Earth County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Becky R. Thorson and Patrick J. Schiltz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:18-CV-02561

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Becky R. Thorson

Presiding Judge

Patrick J. Schiltz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Granite Re, Inc.

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Blue Earth County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joseph A Nilan

Attorney at Gregerson, Rosow, Johnson & Nilan, Ltd.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1550

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Daniel R Gregerson

Attorney at Gregerson, Rosow, Johnson & Nilan, Ltd.

100 Washington Avenue South, Suite 1550

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Roger C Justin

Attorney at Rinke Noonan

Po Box 1497

St Cloud, MN 56302-1497

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Certificate of Service

#12

10 #1

Consent Form

#10

9 #1

Exhibit(s) 1

#9

#8

#7

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: ORDER FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Confidential Letter to Court due by 6/14/2019. Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 6/10/2019. Settlement Conference set for 6/18/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/26/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 2/15/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/15/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 8/2/2019. Motions (disp) due by 10/1/2019. Ready for trial due by 2/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 10/26/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/25/2018. (MSK) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Granite Re, Inc. Jointly signed by Blue Earth County. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 10/19/2018 (kt). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY to Counterclaim filed by Granite Re, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Gregerson, Daniel) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • Docket(#11) (Text-only) NOTICE of Resetting of Hearing, TIME CHANGE ONLY: The Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 will begin at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. (MSK) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/25/2018 at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 9/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (MSK) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Granite Re, Inc.. filed by Blue Earth County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1) (Justin, Roger) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Granite Re, Inc. of Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, and Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Gregerson, Daniel) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Blue Earth County. (kt) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Patrick J. Schiltz per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson. Please use case number 18-cv-2561 PJS/BRT. (kt) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) COMPLAINT against Granite Re, Inc. (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6346623) filed by Granite Re, Inc.. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nilan, Joseph) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - EXHIBIT Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • Docket(#3) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Request to Clerk's Office to Issue Summons for Blue Earth County in Civil Action Granite Re, Inc.. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Federated Mutual Insurance Co is a corporate parent of Plaintiff Granite Re, Inc.. (Nilan, Joseph) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Blue Earth County filed by Granite Re, Inc. (Nilan, Joseph) Modified on 8/31/2018 (KNK). Modified on 9/4/2018 (AKL). (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Granite Re Inc is a litigant