This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 07:57:03 (UTC).

Grange Mutual Casualty Company v. Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Grange Mutual Casualty Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen K. Caldwell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00252

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen K. Caldwell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Grange Mutual Casualty Company

Defendant

Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert L. Steinmetz

Attorney at Gwin Steinmetz & Baird PLLC

401 W. Main Street, One Riverfront Plaza, Suite 1000

Louisville, KY 40202

Defendant Attorneys

Philip G. Fairbanks

Attorney at Mehr Fairbanks & Peterson Trial Lawyers, PLLC

201 W. Short Street, Suite 800

Lexington, KY 40507

M. Austin Mehr

Attorney at Mehr Fairbanks & Peterson Trial Lawyers, PLLC

201 W. Short Street, Suite 800

Lexington, KY 40507

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION for Hearing re #9 Response to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC by Grange Mutual Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#8

(#8) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC. (Fairbanks, Philip) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

7 #6

Proposed Order

7 #5

Exhibit 4 - Fiesta motion and third party complaint

7 #4

Exhibit 3 - Estate motion for leave

7 #3

Exhibit 2 - July 13, 2018 letter

7 #2

Exhibit 1 - State court complaint

7 #1

Memorandum in Support

#7

(#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - State court complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - July 13, 2018 letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Estate motion for leave, #5 Exhibit 4 - Fiesta motion and third party complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(Fairbanks, Philip) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company via Whitley County Constable to Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

5 #3

Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 2) - Policy

5 #2

Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 1) -- Policy

5 #1

Exhibit A to Complaint -- Commercial Insurance Application

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF FILING by Grange Mutual Casualty Company re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint -- Commercial Insurance Application, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 1) -- Policy, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 2) - Policy)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

1 #2

Summons

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Hearing re #9 Response to Motion, #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC by Grange Mutual Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC. (Fairbanks, Philip) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION to Dismiss by Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - State court complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - July 13, 2018 letter, #4 Exhibit 3 - Estate motion for leave, #5 Exhibit 4 - Fiesta motion and third party complaint, #6 Proposed Order)(Fairbanks, Philip) (Entered: 10/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company via Whitley County Constable to Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC served on 10/5/2018, answer due 10/26/2018. (Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF FILING by Grange Mutual Casualty Company re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint -- Commercial Insurance Application, #2 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 1) -- Policy, #3 Exhibit B to Complaint (Part 2) - Policy)(Steinmetz, Robert) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Fiesta Mexicana Restaurant of Corbin, Ky., LLC; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (SYD) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (SYD) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. (SYD) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Grange Mutual Casualty Company. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4179364) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(SYD) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/3/2018: #3 Exhibit A-Commercial Insurance Application, #4 Exhibit B-Part 1--Policy, #5 Exhibit Part 2--Policy) (SYD). (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.