This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2018 at 07:46:33 (UTC).

GRANDE v. STARBUCKS CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 GRANDE filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against STARBUCKS CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is GENE E.K. PRATTER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-04036

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GENE E.K. PRATTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAMES C. GRANDE

Haddon Heights, NJ 08035

Defendants

TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI.

STARBUCKS CORPORATION

HOWARD S. SCHULTZ

1528 WALNUT LIMITED PARTN ASI MGT

ROBERT L. GIUNTOLI

GERADINE F. GIUNTOLI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

MATTHEW C. MONROE

Attorney at MONROE, LLC

30 S. 15Th St. 15Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

JOHN P. TIERNEY

Attorney at THE TIERNEY LAW GROUP, LLC

1259 Route 46 East, Building 3, Suite 133

Parsipanny, NJ 07054

ANTHONY W. HINKLE

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER, PC

450 Sentry Parkway Ste 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422

AMY G. WIRTH

Attorney at CIPRIANI & WERNER

450 Sentry Parkway, Suite 200

Blue Bell, PA 19422-0700

DANTE C. ROHR

Attorney at MARSHALL DENNEHEY WARNER COLEMAN & GOGGIN

15000 Midlantic Drive, Suite 200, P.O. Box 5429

Mt. Laurel, NJ 08054

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by JAMES C. GRANDE. (jaa, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Dismiss filed by STARBUCKS CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

#22

(#22) Memorandum of Law/Service of Summons filed by JAMES C. GRANDE, Certificate of Service. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #20 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY RE #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, RESPONSES DUE BY 11/5/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/4/18.10/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance by AMY G. WIRTH on behalf of HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

8 #3

Exhibit B

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2018. Dismissing as moot #5 MOTION to drop two parties. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/15/2018. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JAMES C. GRANDE (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2018)

5 #1

Certificate of Service

#5

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2018. Dismissing as moot #5 MOTION to drop two parties. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/15/2018. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2018)

4 #1

Certificate of Service

#4

(#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JAMES C. GRANDE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#3

(#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/15/2018.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/25/2018. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1528 WALNUT LIMITED PARTN ASI MGT, ROBERT L. GIUNTOLI, GERADINE F. GIUNTOLI, HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION, TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI. with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/24/2018)

1 #2

receipt

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO THE MOTIONS TO DISMISS WITH CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by JAMES C. GRANDE. (jaa, ) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MOTION to Dismiss filed by STARBUCKS CORPORATION.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) Memorandum of Law/Service of Summons filed by JAMES C. GRANDE, Certificate of Service. (mbh, ) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #20 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE/REPLY RE #20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, RESPONSES DUE BY 11/5/2018.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GENE E.K. PRATTER ON 10/4/18.10/5/18 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED AND E-MAILED.(rab, ) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, filed by HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION.Certificate of Service.(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by AMY G. WIRTH on behalf of HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(WIRTH, AMY) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance by ANTHONY W. HINKLE on behalf of HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION with Jury Demand and Certificate of Service(HINKLE, ANTHONY) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) First MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI..Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(MONROE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by 1528 WALNUT LIMITED PARTN ASI MGT.Motion, Memorandum of law, Order, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(ROHR, DANTE) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by MATTHEW C. MONROE on behalf of TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI. with Certificate of Service(MONROE, MATTHEW) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Plead, or Otherwise Move by HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Tierney, Esq., #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(TIERNEY, JOHN) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 9/14/2018. Dismissing as moot #5 MOTION to drop two parties. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 8/15/2018. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by JAMES C. GRANDE (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Reset Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to drop two parties. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #5 MOTION to drop two parties. Motion set for 9/4/2018 before Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to drop two parties by JAMES C. GRANDE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JAMES C. GRANDE. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/15/2018.. Signed by Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 7/25/2018. (rtm, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to 1528 WALNUT LIMITED PARTN ASI MGT, ROBERT L. GIUNTOLI, GERADINE F. GIUNTOLI, HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION, TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI. with answer to complaint due within 21 days. (rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against 1528 WALNUT LIMITED PARTN ASI MGT, ROBERT L. GIUNTOLI, GERADINE F. GIUNTOLI, HOWARD S. SCHULTZ, STARBUCKS CORPORATION, TWO SIX TWO S. 18TH ASSOCI. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number CAM009825), filed by JAMES C. GRANDE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 receipt)(rss, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 9/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Starbucks Corp is a litigant