This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/13/2018 at 07:10:23 (UTC).

In Re Subpoena to IP-Echelon PTY, Ltd

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 In Re Subpoena to IP-Echelon PTY, Ltd was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Paul L. Abrams. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-MC-00125

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Paul L. Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Capitol Christian Music Group, Inc.

Roadrunner Records, Inc.

Arista Records LLC

LaFace Records LLC

Warner Bros. Records Inc.

Elektra Entertainment Group Inc.

Zomba Recording LLC

Sony Music Entertainment

Arista Music

Roc-A-Fella Records LLC

Capitol Records, LLC

Tooth and Nail, LLC

Atlantic Recording Corporation

Rhino Entertainment Company

Fonovisa, Inc.

Nonesuch Records Inc.

Fueled by Ramen LLC

Petitioner and Defendant

Grande Communications Networks LLC

Respondent

IP Echelon PTY Ltd

In Re

Subpoena to IP-Echelon PTY Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Defendant Attorneys

Ian A Stewart

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman and Dicker LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Nicholas B Clifford, Jr

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Boulevard Suite 1800

St Louis, MO 63105

Michael W Carwin

Attorney at Armstrong Teasdale LLP

7700 Forsyth Boulevard Suite 1800

St Louis, MO 63105-1847

 

Court Documents

#9

8 #1

Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Applicartion

#8

#7

1 #15

Exhibit 14

1 #14

Exhibit 13

1 #13

Exhibit 12

1 #12

Exhibit 11

1 #11

Exhibit 10

1 #10

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 7

1 #7

Exhibit 6

1 #6

Exhibit 5

1 #5

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Declaration

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Grande Communications Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22470524) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. Other error(s) with document(s): IL missing. (lt) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas B. Clifford, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Grande Communications Networks LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-22470524) filed by Movant Grande Communications Networks LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice Applicartion) (Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams: re: MISC - Motion Related to Subpoena from Another District #1 . As movant has notcomplied in full with Local Rule 37, including by presenting the current dispute in the form of a Joint Stipulation, the Motion to Compel (ECF No. 1) is denied without prejudice. (et) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT UPON RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment Discovery pursuant to General Order 05-07. Case randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Magistrate Judge Paul L. Abrams for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:18-mc-00125 GW(PLAx). (rn) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Nicholas B Clifford. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (car) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Movant Grande Communications Networks LLC, (Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Grande Communications Networks LLC. (Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION RELATED TO A SUBPOENA FROM ANOTHER DISTRICT Receipt No: 0973-22425640 - Fee: $47, filed by movant Grande Communications Networks LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14) (Attorney Ian A Stewart added to party Grande Communications Networks LLC(pty:bkmov))(Stewart, Ian) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Tooth & Nail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Grande Communications Networks LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Roc-A-Fella Records LLC is a litigant