This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2018 at 07:32:47 (UTC).

GRACE et al v. SESSIONS et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 GRACE filed an Other lawsuit against SESSIONS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Emmet G. Sullivan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01853

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Emmet G. Sullivan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GIO

MARIA

GRACE

GINA

MINA

CARMEN

A.P.A.

J.A.C.F.

NORA

MONA

A.B.A.

CINDY ARDON MEJIA

Defendants

LEE FRANCIS CISSNA

KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN

JAMES MCHENRY

JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III

Amicus Curiae

MASSACHUSETTS

MARYLAND

HAWAII

NEW MEXICO

19 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Arthur B. Spitzer

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street, Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Jennifer Chang Newell

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Scott Michelman

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION OF THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

915 15Th Street, Nw, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20005

Cody H. Wofsy

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

39 Drumm Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Emma Jane Roth

Attorney at EQUAL JUSTICE WORKS FELLOW

125 Broad St

New York, NY 10004

Karen Musalo

Attorney at HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Andre Ivan Segura

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION OF TEXAS

5225 Katy Freeway, Suite 350

Houston, TX 77007

Omar C. Jadwat

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Judy Rabinovitz

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION FOUNDATION

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Ann Kathleen Scholten Dutton

Attorney at HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Katrina Eiland

Attorney at AMERICAN CIVIL LIBERTIES UNION

39 Drumm St

San Francisco, CA 94111

Celso Perez

Attorney at ACLU IMMIGRANTS' RIGHTS PROJECT

125 Broad Street, 18Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Anne Kathleen Scholten Dutton

Attorney at HASTINGS COLLEGE OF THE LAW

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Eunice Lee

Attorney at UC Hastings Center for Gender and Refugee Studies

200 Mcallister Street

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant Attorneys

Erez Reuveni

Attorney at UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Joshua Samuel Press

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868

Washington, DC 20044

Joseph Anton Darrow

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868

Washington, DC 20044

Amicus Curiae Attorney

Stephanie Litos

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

441 4Th Street, Nw, Suite 630 South

Washington, DC 20001

Other Attorneys

Thomas K. Ragland

Attorney at CLARK HILL PLC

1001 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw, Suite 1300 South

Washington, DC 20004

Anjum Gupta

Attorney at RUTGERS LAW SCHOOL

123 Washington Street

Newark, NJ 07102

8 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal; further ordered, that the list of the full names of the plaintiffs and their children shall remain under seal until further order of the Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 07, 2018. (See Order for Full Details) (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#3

(#4) SEALED Declarations filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. re #3 Complaint, filed by MARIA, A.B.A., J.A.C.F., CINDY ARDON MEJIA, A.P.A., GINA, MINA, MONA, CARMEN, GIO, GRACE, NORA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody H. Wofsy, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Right Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628203. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

5 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

6 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Chang Newell, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

7 #1

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

#79

(#79) NOTICE of Appearance by Celso Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perez, Celso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#84

(#84) AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED NATIONS HIGH COMMISSIONER FOR REFUGEES. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

73 #2

Text of Proposed Order

73 #1

Exhibit Brief of UNHCR as Amicus Curiae

#73

MINUTE ORDER granting #73 UNHCR's consent motion to file brief as amicus curiae. UNHCR's brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/3/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#83

(#83) AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#82

(#82) AMICUS BRIEF by CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#81

(#81) AMICUS BRIEF by ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

#80

(#80) AMICUS BRIEF by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) NOTICE of Appearance by Celso Perez on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Perez, Celso) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#84) AMICUS BRIEF by UNITED NATIONS HIGH COMMISSIONER FOR REFUGEES. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #73 UNHCR's consent motion to file brief as amicus curiae. UNHCR's brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/3/2018. (lcegs3) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Opposition and Reply due by 10/10/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 10/24/2018. Joint Submission due by 10/31/2018. (mac) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) AMICUS BRIEF by IMMIGRATION LAW PROFESSORS. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) AMICUS BRIEF by CALIFORNIA, CONNECTICUT, DELAWARE, DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, HAWAII, ILLINOIS, IOWA, MAINE, MARYLAND, MASSACHUSETTS, MINNESOTA, NEW JERSEY, NEW MEXICO, NEW YORK, OREGON, RHODE ISLAND, VERMONT, VIRGINIA, WASHINGTON. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) AMICUS BRIEF by ADMINISTRATIVE LAW PROFESSORS. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) AMICUS BRIEF by TAHIRIH JUSTICE CENTER. (jf) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #77 motion to file brief of amici curiae by Immigration Law Professors. The Immigration Law Professors' brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER granting #76 motion to file brief as amici curiae. The District of Columbia and the states of California, Connecticut, Delaware, Hawaii, Illinois, Iowa, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Minnesota, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, Oregon, Rhode Island, Vermont, Virginia, and Washington's brief is hereby deemed filed. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 10/2/2018. (lcegs2, ) (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
104 More Docket Entries
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur B. Spitzer on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Spitzer, Arthur) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katrina Eiland, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628296. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Judy Rabinovitz, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 125 Broad St, 18th Floor, New York, NY 10004. Phone No. - 212-549-2618. Fax No. - 212-549-2654 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628273. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Jennifer Chang Newell, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Rights Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628241. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Cody H. Wofsy, :Firm- American Civil Liberties Union Foundation Immigrants' Right Project, :Address- 39 Drumm St, San Francisco, CA 94111. Phone No. - 415-343-0770. Fax No. - 415-395-0950 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5628203. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Michelman, Scott) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER. In view of the forthcoming motion for temporary restraining order, the Court, sua sponte, schedules a status conference for August 8, 2018 at 2:00 pm in Courtroom 24A. Plaintiffs are HEREBY DIRECTED to contact forthwith the United States Attorney's Office for the District or Columbia and/or the Department of Justice as appropriate to identify government counsel. Signed by Judge Emmet G. Sullivan on 8/8/2018. (lcegs2) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SEALED Declarations filed by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA. re #3 Complaint, filed by MARIA, A.B.A., J.A.C.F., CINDY ARDON MEJIA, A.P.A., GINA, MINA, MONA, CARMEN, GIO, GRACE, NORA. (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(zjf) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against LEE FRANCIS CISSNA, JAMES MCHENRY, KIRSTJEN M. NIELSEN, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616094025) filed by CINDY ARDON MEJIA, J.A.C.F., MINA, GRACE, CARMEN, GINA, NORA, A.P.A., GIO, MONA, A.B.A., MARIA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) Modified on 8/10/2018 (zrdj). (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal; further ordered, that the list of the full names of the plaintiffs and their children shall remain under seal until further order of the Court.. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 07, 2018. (See Order for Full Details) (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms and to File Supporting Exhibits Under Seal by A.B.A., A.P.A., CARMEN, GINA, GIO, GRACE, J.A.C.F., MARIA, CINDY ARDON MEJIA, MINA, MONA, NORA (jf) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.