This case was last updated from PACER on 01/14/2019 at 07:55:08 (UTC).

Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Herron et al

Case Summary

On 11/15/2018 Government Employees Insurance Co filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Herron. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diane K. Vescovo and John T. Fowlkes, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02798

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

Presiding Judge

John T. Fowlkes, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Government Employees Insurance Co.

Geico Secure Insurance Company

Geico Indemnity Co.

Geico Choice Insurance Company

Geico Casualty Co.

Geico General Insurance Company

Geico County Mutual Insurance Company

Defendants

FBS Collision LLC

John Doe Defendants 1-15

Edrica Herron

Calvin Abram

India Drains

Antonio Crump, Jr.

Edmond M. Herron

Ariana York

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George T. Lewis, III

Attorney at BAKER DONELSON BEARMAN CALDWELL & BERKOWITZ

First Tennessee Bank Building, 165 Madison Ave., Ste. 2000

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#13

(#13) Summons Issued as to FBS Collision LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Calvin Abram. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Antonio Crump, Jr.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Summons by George T. Lewis, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses (Please Issue for Private Process Service))(Lewis, George) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit A - Summonses (Please Issue for Private Process Service)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2926034), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, George) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Edmond M. Herron. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Ariana York. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

#12

(#12) Summons Issued as to India Drains. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#11

(#11) Summons Issued as to Edrica Herron. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Summons Issued as to FBS Collision LLC. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Summons Issued as to India Drains. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Edrica Herron. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Calvin Abram. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Ariana York. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Antonio Crump, Jr.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Edmond M. Herron. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Summons by George T. Lewis, III on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summonses (Please Issue for Private Process Service))(Lewis, George) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2926034), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lewis, George) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.