This case was last updated from PACER on 04/02/2018 at 12:14:17 (UTC).

GOT I, LLC et al v. XRT, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2016 GOT I, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against XRT, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William S. Duffey. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:16-CV-00038

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William S. Duffey

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

GOT I, LLC

Kids II, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Claimants

XRT, Inc.

David Eugene Silverglate

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Wendell Staley(Designation Retained)

Scott P. Amy(Designation Retained)

Dan Robert Gresham

Wesley Austin Roberts(Designation Retained)

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Amy Melissa Durrence(Designation Retained)

Renee E. Rothauge(Designation Retained)

Adam M. Starr(Designation Retained)

Henry D. Fellows, Jr.(Designation Retained)

 

Court Documents

#128

(#128) ORDER DENYING Defendants XRT, Inc. and David Eugene Silverglates' 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING Plaintiffs GOT I, LLC and Kids II,Inc.'s 60 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and GRANTING the parties motions to file matters under seal ( 63 , 77 , 80 , 88 , 99 , 102 , 106 , 110 , 117 ). Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 3/16/17. (jkl)

#64

(#64) OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs GOT I, LLC and Kids II, Inc.s Motions for Leave to File Matters Under Seal 40 , 59 and granting Defendants XRT, Inc. and David Eugene Silverglates Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal 49 . Defendants are required to file, on or before October 21, 2016, the APA with the redactions required by the Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/14/16. (ddm)

#54

(#54) ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint on or before 10/12/16. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 10/5/16. (jkl)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#128) ORDER DENYING Defendants XRT, Inc. and David Eugene Silverglates' 47 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; GRANTING Plaintiffs GOT I, LLC and Kids II,Inc.'s 60 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and GRANTING the parties motions to file matters under seal ( 63 , 77 , 80 , 88 , 99 , 102 , 106 , 110 , 117 ). Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 3/16/17. (jkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#64) OPINION AND ORDER granting Plaintiffs GOT I, LLC and Kids II, Inc.s Motions for Leave to File Matters Under Seal 40 , 59 and granting Defendants XRT, Inc. and David Eugene Silverglates Motion for Leave to File Matters Under Seal 49 . Defendants are required to file, on or before October 21, 2016, the APA with the redactions required by the Order. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 10/14/16. (ddm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#54) ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint on or before 10/12/16. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 10/5/16. (jkl)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kids Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Dan Robert Gresham