This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/29/2018 at 11:01:32 (UTC).

Gordon v. Campanella et al

Case Summary

On 02/10/2017 Gordon filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Campanella. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David R. Herndon. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David R. Herndon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Gordon

Defendants

Doctor Apostol

Lieutenant Parish

Vineyard

Wexford Health Sources, Inc.

J Campanella

Luce

Buckmeier

P George

Major Campbell

Unknown Party

 

Court Documents

#6

#38

#50

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING CASE: The Court DISMISSES with prejudice Gordon's claims for failure to prosecute. The Clerk is DIRECTED to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 10/25/2017. (lmp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS: The 26 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS are adopted in their entirety. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's 17 MOTION to Supplement for the reasons given in the Report and Recommendation, and DISMISSES with prejudice Count 3 of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 9/8/2017. (lmp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephen C. Williams. Signed by Judge David R. Herndon on 3/23/2017. (tjk)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Vineyards is a litigant

Latest cases where Luce is a litigant

Latest cases where Wexford Health Soures Inc. is a litigant