This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 11:14:54 (UTC).

Good L Corporation v. Fasteners for Retail, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/24/2018 Good L Corporation filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Fasteners for Retail, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jeffery S. Frensley and William L. Campbell, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00489

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Good L Corporation

Defendants

Fasteners for Retail, Inc.

Fasteners for Retail, Inc. doing business as FFR Merchandising, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edward D. Lanquist, Jr.

Attorney at Patterson Intellectual Property Law, P.C. (Nashville Office)

1600 Division Street, Suite 500

Nashville, TN 37203

Scott McLean Douglass

Attorney at Patterson Intellectual Property Law, P.C. (Nashville Office)

1600 Division Street, Suite 500

Nashville, TN 37203

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen J. Zralek

Attorney at Bone, McAllester & Norton, PLLC (Nashville Office)

511 Union Street, Suite 1600

Nashville, TN 37219

Mary A. Hyde

Attorney at Honigman Miller Schwartz and Cohn LLP

315 East Eisenhower Parkway, Suite 100

Ann Arbor, MI 48108

William B. Berndt

Attorney at Honigman, Miller, Schwartz & Cohn LLP

155 North Wacker Drive, Suite 3100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Allow Out of Town Counsel to Participate by Telephone. Additionally, the Initial Case Management Conference set for July 26, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby continued to September 19, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/19/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#25

(#25) MOTION To allow out of town counsel to participate in Initial Case Management Conference by telephone re #5 Notice of Case Management Conference by Fasteners for Retail, Inc.. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

24 #19

Exhibit S

24 #18

Exhibit R

24 #17

Exhibit Q

24 #16

Exhibit P

24 #15

Exhibit O

24 #14

Exhibit N

#24

(#24) NOTICE of Filing by Fasteners for Retail, Inc. re #23 Memorandum in Support, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Attachment 2 McCarthy on Trademarks and Unfair Competition 12:34 (5th ed.))(Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Good L Corporation. Fasteners for Retail, Inc. served on 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit)(Lanquist, Edward) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/29/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons issued as to Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

#5

(#25) MOTION To allow out of town counsel to participate in Initial Case Management Conference by telephone re #5 Notice of Case Management Conference by Fasteners for Retail, Inc.. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Good L Corporation. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2679331), filed by Good L Corporation. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearings: Case Management Conference RESET for 9/19/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #25 Motion to Allow Out of Town Counsel to Participate by Telephone. Additionally, the Initial Case Management Conference set for July 26, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. is hereby continued to September 19, 2018, at 10:30 a.m. before the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/19/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION To allow out of town counsel to participate in Initial Case Management Conference by telephone re #5 Notice of Case Management Conference by Fasteners for Retail, Inc.. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Filing by Fasteners for Retail, Inc. re #23 Memorandum in Support, #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Attachment 2 McCarthy on Trademarks and Unfair Competition 12:34 (5th ed.))(Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM in Support of #22 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting #17 Motion for Mary A. Hyde to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/17/18. (gb) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • OH State Bar status verified as active for Mary A. Hyde. (gb) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER granting #12 Motion for William Berndt to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/16/18. (gb) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Filing by Fasteners for Retail, Inc. re #17 MOTION for attorney(s) Mary A. Hyde to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0650-2708689) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing)(Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen J. Zralek on behalf of Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (Zralek, Stephen) (Entered: 06/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS returned executed by Good L Corporation. Fasteners for Retail, Inc. served on 5/29/2018. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Affidavit)(Lanquist, Edward) (Entered: 05/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/29/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 05/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons issued as to Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/26/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 661 before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Edward D. Lanquist, Jr. and Scott McLean Douglass. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Good L Corporation. (gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Fasteners for Retail, Inc. (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2679331), filed by Good L Corporation. Service copies will be picked up by counsel. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fasteners for Retail, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where GOOD is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott McLean Douglass

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward D Lanquist, Jr