This case was last updated from PACER on 11/13/2018 at 07:42:23 (UTC).

Gonzalez et al v. Weatherford

Case Summary

On 09/14/2018 Gonzalez filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Weatherford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gregory A. Presnell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01524

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

 

Party Details

Appellants and In Re

Maria G. Ceballos

Kissimmee, FL 34744

Edward D. Gonzalez

Kissimmee, FL 34744

Appellees and Interested Parties

Citibank, N.A.

Laurie K. Weatherford

Winter Park, FL 32790

Interested Parties and Trustees

United States Trustee - ORL7/13,7

George C Young Federal Building, 400 West Washington Street, Suite 1100

Orlando, FL 32801

Citibank, N.A.

Laurie K. Weatherford

Winter Park, FL 32790

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Rafael Francisco Garcia

Attorney at Ralph F. Garcia PLLC

220 Palmetto Ave

Orlando, FL 32801

Appellee and Interested Party Attorneys

Amy M. Kiser

Attorney at Gilbert Garcia Group, PA

2313 W Violet St

Tampa, FL 33603-1423

Michelle Garcia Gilbert

Attorney at Gilbert Garcia Group, PA

2313 W Violet St

Tampa, FL 33603-1423

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER denying #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/24/2018. (TKW) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. (Garcia, Rafael) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 09/14/2018. (BIA) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

12 #19

Doc No 83 - Appellant Designation

12 #18

Doc No 82 - BNC Certificate of Mailing

12 #17

Doc No 80 - Request for Transcript

12 #11

Doc No 73 - Certificate of Mailing via Bankruptcy Noticing Center re Notice of

12 #10

Doc No 72 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order

12 #9

Doc No 71 - Order Directing Immediate Payment of Filing Fee

12 #8

Doc No 69 - Notice of Unavailability

12 #7

Doc No 67 - Request for Transcript

12 #6

Doc No 66 - Statement of Issues

12 #5

Doc No 65 - Statement of Election

12 #4

Doc No 63 - Amended Proof of Service

12 #3

Doc No 60 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Int

12 #2

Doc No 59 - Hearing Proceeding Memo

12 #1

Doc No 58 - Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice

#12

(#12) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Notice of Deficient Filing Doc No = 57 filed by Edward D. Gonzalez, Maria G. Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Doc No 58 - Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, #2 Doc No 59 - Hearing Proceeding Memo, #3 Doc No 60 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest, #4 Doc No 63 - Amended Proof of Service, #5 Doc No 65 - Statement of Election, #6 Doc No 66 - Statement of Issues, #7 Doc No 67 - Request for Transcript, #8 Doc No 69 - Notice of Unavailability, #9 Doc No 71 - Order Directing Immediate Payment of Filing Fee, #10 Doc No 72 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order, #11 Doc No 73 - Certificate of Mailing via Bankruptcy Noticing Center re Notice of Appeal, #12 Doc No 74 - Notice to Appellant of Responsibilities, #13 Doc No 76 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #14 Doc No 77 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #15 Doc No 78 - Amended District Transmittal of Notice of Appea, #16 Doc No 79 - Statement of Issues, #17 Doc No 80 - Request for Transcript, #18 Doc No 82 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #19 Doc No 83 - Appellant Designation)(ML) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER denying #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 10/24/2018. (TKW) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Initial Brief by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. (Garcia, Rafael) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of docketing bankruptcy record on appeal advising counsel to comply with Rule 8018. Notice of appeal filed in U.S. District Court on 09/14/2018. (BIA) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Notice of Deficient Filing Doc No = 57 filed by Edward D. Gonzalez, Maria G. Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Doc No 58 - Amended Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, #2 Doc No 59 - Hearing Proceeding Memo, #3 Doc No 60 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice to Creditors and Parties in Interest, #4 Doc No 63 - Amended Proof of Service, #5 Doc No 65 - Statement of Election, #6 Doc No 66 - Statement of Issues, #7 Doc No 67 - Request for Transcript, #8 Doc No 69 - Notice of Unavailability, #9 Doc No 71 - Order Directing Immediate Payment of Filing Fee, #10 Doc No 72 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order, #11 Doc No 73 - Certificate of Mailing via Bankruptcy Noticing Center re Notice of Appeal, #12 Doc No 74 - Notice to Appellant of Responsibilities, #13 Doc No 76 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #14 Doc No 77 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #15 Doc No 78 - Amended District Transmittal of Notice of Appea, #16 Doc No 79 - Statement of Issues, #17 Doc No 80 - Request for Transcript, #18 Doc No 82 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #19 Doc No 83 - Appellant Designation)(ML) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Motion to Modify Doc No - 36 filed by Edward D. Gonzalez, Maria G. Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Doc No 37 - Order Granting Motion To Vacate Order, #2 Doc No 38 - Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Vacate Order, #3 Doc No 39 - Consent to Motion to Modify Confirmed Plan, #4 Doc No 40 - Notice of Change of Address, #5 Doc No 41 - Order Granting Motion To Modify Confirmed Plan, #6 Doc No 42 - Certificate Regarding Domestic Support Obligation, #7 Doc No 43 - Notice Report of Completion of Plan, #8 Doc No 44 - Order Discharging Debtor After Completion of Plan, #9 Doc No 45 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order of Discharge, #10 Doc No 46 - Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account, #11 Doc No 47 - Order Approving Chapter 13 Account, Discharging Trustee, #12 Doc No 48 - Notice of Change of Payment Address, #13 Doc No 49 - Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice, #14 Doc No 50 - Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case, #15 Doc No 51 - Order Abating Motion To Reopen Chapter 13 Case, #16 Doc No 52 - Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case, #17 Doc No 53 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order, #18 Doc No 54 - Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion to Reopen Chapter 13 Case, #19 Doc No 55 - Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice on Behalf of the Debtor, #20 Doc No 56 - Opposition to Motion to Reopen Bankruptcy Case)(ML) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: Mortgage Modification Mediation Order Doc No - 17 filed by Edward D. Gonzalez, Maria G. Ceballos. (Attachments: #1 Doc No 18 - Proof of Service of Mortgage Modification Mediation Order, #2 Doc No 19 - Notice of Confirmation Hearing, #3 Doc No 20 - Order Granting Motion to Strip Lien, #4 Doc No 21 - Motion for Amended Mortgage Modification Mediation Order and to Compel Creditor to Comply with Mediation Orde, #5 Doc No 22 - Objection to Claim(s). Claim No 01 of Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, #6 Doc No 23 - Objection to Claim(s). Claim No 02 of International Collection Services; Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, #7 Doc No 24 - Proof of Service of Order Granting Motion to Avoid Second Mortgage Lien of Real Time Resolution, #8 Doc No 25 - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #1 of Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, #9 Doc No 26 - Order Sustaining Objection to Claim(s) #2 of International Collection Services; Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, #10 Doc No 27 - Proof of Service of Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No 1 of Jefferson Capital Systems, LL, #11 Doc No 28 - Proof of Service of Order Sustaining Objection to Claim No 2 of International Collection Services; Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC, #12 Doc No 29 - Notice of Preliminary Hearing on Motion for Amended Mortgage Modification Mediation Order and to Compel Creditor to Comply with Mediation Orde, #13 Doc No 30 - Hearing Proceeding Memo, #14 Doc No 31 - Order Confirming Chapter 13 Plan, #15 Doc No 32 - Amended Mortgage Modification Mediation Order With Nationstar Mortgage, #16 Doc No 33 - Proof of Service of Order Directing Mortgage Modification Mediation, #17 doc Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses and Charges Related to Claim 4, #18 Doc No 34 - Request for Notice, #19 Doc No 35 - Motion to Vacate)(ML) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BANKRUPTCY RECORD on appeal received consisting of items as designated on transmittal including: filed by Edward D. Gonzalez, Maria G. Ceballos. (Attachments: Transmittal of Record #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Doc 61 - Order Granting Motion to Reopen Case, #3 Doc No 68 Designation of Items to be Included, #4 Doc No 1 - Voluntary Petition under Chapter 13, #5 Doc No 3 - Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Electronic Filing Regarding Petition, Schedules, and Statement of Affairs, #6 Doc No 4 - Certificate of Credit Counseling, #7 Doc No 5 - Chapter 13 Plan, #8 Doc No 6 - Notice of Commencement of Case, Section 341 Meeting of Creditors, #9 Doc No 7 - Order Establishing Duties of Trustee and Debtor, #10 Doc No 8 - Plan sent to BNC for service, #11 Doc No 9 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Order, #12 Doc No 10 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Meeting of Creditors, #13 Doc No 11 - BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document, #14 Doc No 12 - Notice of Requirement to File a Statement of Completion of Course in Personal Financial Managemen, #15 Doc No 13 - BNC Certificate of Mailing, #16 Doc No 14 - Certificate of Debtor Education Concerning Personal Financial Management Received from Agenc, #17 Doc No 15 - Motion for Referral to Mortgage Modification Mediation, #18 Doc No 16 - Motion to Strip Lien of Real Time Resolutions and for Determination that Claim is Unsecured) (ML) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement #3 Interested persons order by Citibank, N.A.. (Kiser, Amy) Modified on 10/3/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Citibank, N.A.. Related case(s): yes (Kiser, Amy) Modified on 10/3/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of pendency of related cases #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. Related case(s): Yes (Garcia, Rafael) Modified on 10/3/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement #3 Interested persons order by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. (Garcia, Rafael) Modified on 10/3/2018 (BIA). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Amended BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:14-BK-04145-ABB. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/05/2018. (Attachments: #1 Amended Transmittal of Notice of Appeal)(BIA) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER to the parties. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/18/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 9/18/2018. Copies mailed. (LAM) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) BANKRUPTCY notice of appeal by Maria G. Ceballos, Edward D. Gonzalez. Bankruptcy Court case number 6:14-BK-04145-ABB. Filed in Bankruptcy Court on 09/05/2018. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to District Court)(BIA) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.