This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 08:09:17 (UTC).

Gonzales v. Garcia et al

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Gonzales filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Garcia. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nita L. Stormes and Michael M. Anello. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01830

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nita L. Stormes

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Anello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julian Gonzales

San Diego, CA 92139

Defendants

Smart and Final, .

Moses Garcia

Smart and Final extra

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Guillermo A. Escobedo

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

225 Broadway, Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Ellen E. Cohen

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

Theresa Marie Marchlewski

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

725 South Figueroa Street, Suite 2500

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5408

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court grants Defendants' motion and dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) (dsn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants' motion and dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) (dsn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

5 #4

Proof of Service

5 #3

Notice to Pro Se Litigant

5 #2

Declaration of Ellen E. Cohen ISO Motion to Dismiss

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Ellen E. Cohen ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, #4 Proof of Service)(Cohen, Ellen) Modified to correct event on 8/23/2018 (rmc). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra re #2 Notice (Other) (Cohen, Ellen). (jah). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Guillermo A. Escobedo by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marchlewski, Theresa). Attorney Theresa Marie Marchlewski added to party Moses Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Theresa Marie Marchlewski added to party Smart and Final extra (pty:dft). (jah). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final (Cohen, Ellen)Attorney Ellen E. Cohen added to party Moses Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Ellen E. Cohen added to party Smart and Final(pty:dft) Sent courtesy QC mail re event, lack of case number, Proof of Service; No interested parties identified (rmc). (Entered: 08/20/2018)

1 #6

Proof of Service

1 #5

Declaration of Moses Garcia

1 #4

Exhibit A to Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo

1 #3

Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00025171-CU-CR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11569846.), filed by Smart and Final, Moses Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo, #5 Declaration of Moses Garcia, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1830-MMA-NLS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S JUDGMENT. The Court grants Defendants' motion and dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) (dsn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER Granting #5 Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Dismiss. The Court grants Defendants' motion and dismisses this action in its entirety without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close the case. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/10/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc) (dsn) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Minute Order Taking Motion Under Submission: Defendants have filed a #5 motion to dismiss Plaintiff's claims, currently set for hearing on October 1, 2018. To date, the motion is unopposed. The Court in its discretion finds the motion suitable for determination without oral argument. See SD CivLR 7.1.d.1; Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b). Accordingly, no appearances are required and the previously scheduled hearing will be taken off calendar. The Court will issue a written ruling in due course. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on 09/25/2018. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (amk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities ISO Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Ellen E. Cohen ISO Motion to Dismiss, #3 Notice to Pro Se Litigant, #4 Proof of Service)(Cohen, Ellen) Modified to correct event on 8/23/2018 (rmc). (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra re #2 Notice (Other) (Cohen, Ellen). (jah). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Attorney Guillermo A. Escobedo by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final extra (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Marchlewski, Theresa). Attorney Theresa Marie Marchlewski added to party Moses Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Theresa Marie Marchlewski added to party Smart and Final extra (pty:dft). (jah). (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties by Moses Garcia, Smart and Final (Cohen, Ellen)Attorney Ellen E. Cohen added to party Moses Garcia(pty:dft), Attorney Ellen E. Cohen added to party Smart and Final(pty:dft) Sent courtesy QC mail re event, lack of case number, Proof of Service; No interested parties identified (rmc). (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California for the County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00025171-CU-CR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11569846.), filed by Smart and Final, Moses Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo, #4 Exhibit A to Declaration of Guillermo Escobedo, #5 Declaration of Moses Garcia, #6 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:18-cv-1830-MMA-NLS. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes are assigned to the case.(lrc) (sjt). (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less