This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 07:21:34 (UTC).

Gonzales et al v. City of Trinidad, Colorado et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2015 Gonzales filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Trinidad, Colorado. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael E. Hegarty and Wiley Y. Daniel. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:15-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael E. Hegarty

Presiding Judge

Wiley Y. Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Felicia Valdez

Danika Gonzales

Interested Party

The State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace

Sara R. Neel

Jaclyn B. Freeman

Mark Silverstein

Nathan Andrew Schacht

Marc David Flink

Aaron John Thompson

Paul Gregory Karlsgodt

Casie D. Collignon

Interested Party Attorney

Sueanna Park Johnson

 

Court Documents

#49

#48

#47

46 #1

Proposed Order (PDF Only)

#46

#45

#44

#43

#42

4 #1

Summons

#3

1 #6

Summons Vigil

1 #5

Summons Martin

1 #4

Summons City of Trinidad

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re: #47 the Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant City of Trinidad. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the Stipulation for Dismissal of Defendant City of Trinidad ECF No. #47 is APPROVED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that all claims asserted against the City of Trinidad are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/2016. (evana, ) (Entered: 10/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) ORDER Granting #46 Plaintiffs' Unopposed Motion for Dismissal of Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil With Prejudice. It is further ORDERED that the Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear his or her own costs and attorneys fees, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 10/21/2016.(evana, ) (Entered: 10/21/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Party - Defendant City of Trinidad by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Collignon, Casie) (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party -Defendants Phil Martin and Arsenio Vigil with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Collignon, Casie) (Entered: 10/20/2016)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) MINUTE ORDER The minute order issued on July 6, 2015 ECF No. #44 is VACATED. The Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case ECF No. #43 is GRANTED. Accordingly, this case is administratively closed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2 with leave to be reopened upon a showing of good cause, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/7/2015. (evana, ) (Entered: 07/07/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) VACATED MINUTE ORDER Denying #43 The Joint Motion to Administratively Close Case WITHOUT PREJUDICE due to the parties failure to provide a basis for the requested relief. However, should the parties choose to refile the motion with appropriate support, I will consider the request for an administrative closure under D.C.COLO.LCivR 41.2, by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 7/6/2015.(evana, ) (Modified on 7/7/2015 Vacated pursuant to the #45 Minute Order)(evana, ). (Entered: 07/06/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Joint MOTION for Order to Administratively Close Case by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Collignon, Casie) (Entered: 07/01/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 6/25/2015. (mdave, ) (Entered: 06/26/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) NOTICE of Withdrawal of Subpoena to the State of Colorado, Probation Department for the Third Judicial District by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez (Collignon, Casie) (Entered: 06/25/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/19/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) MINUTE ENTRY FOR SETTLEMENT for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Settlement Conference held on 6/19/2015. Settlement negotiations were held on 6/18/2015-6/19/2015, and no settlement has been reached as to any claims in this action. (mdave, ) (Entered: 06/22/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS issued by Clerk as to Phil Martin. Magistrate Judge Consent form issued pursuant to Local Rule (Attachments: #1 Summons Arsenio Vigil, #2 Summons City of Trinidad, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, ) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nathan Andrew Schacht on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Nathan Andrew Schacht added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Nathan Andrew Schacht added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Schacht, Nathan) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Casie D. Collignon on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Casie D. Collignon added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Collignon, Casie) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara R. Neel on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Sara R. Neel added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Sara R. Neel added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Neel, Sara) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Rebecca Teitelbaum Wallace added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Wallace, Rebecca) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mark Silverstein on behalf of Danika Gonzales, Felicia ValdezAttorney Mark Silverstein added to party Danika Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Mark Silverstein added to party Felicia Valdez(pty:pla) (Silverstein, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to City of Trinidad by Plaintiffs Danika Gonzales, Felicia Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Consent Form issued pursuant to Local Rule. The summons submitted is not on the court approved form, and not issued. Please file completed summons for issuance using the event Summons Request. (jofox ) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Wiley Y. Daniel and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (jofox ) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against City of Trinidad, Colorado, Phil Martin, Arsenio Vigil (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-4214710)Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Danika D. Gonzales(pty:pla), Attorney Paul Gregory Karlsgodt added to party Felicia A. Valdez(pty:pla), filed by Danika D. Gonzales, Felicia A. Valdez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons City of Trinidad, #5 Summons Martin, #6 Summons Vigil)(Karlsgodt, Paul) (Entered: 01/08/2015)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less