This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 08:06:29 (UTC).

Gonce v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Gonce filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Travis R McDonough and Clifton L Corker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00203

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Travis R McDonough

Referral Judge

Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Westley Gonce

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Brooke Hern

Attorney at Walker & Hern, LLC

60 Washington Street, Suite 102G

Morristown, NJ 07960

Britney Anne Heath McDonald

Attorney at Marc Whitehead & Associates, LLP

403 Heights Boulevard

Houston, TX 77007

Hudson T Ellis

Attorney at Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC

414 Mccallie Avenue

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Robert T. Szyba

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 Eighth Avenue, 32 Floor

New York, NY 10018

Cyrus L Booker

Attorney at Booker Legal Group, P.C.

205 Powell Place, Suite 314

Brentwood, TN 37027

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Britney Anne Heath McDonald) (AMP) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

#27

(#27) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney J. Brooke Hern terminated. (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

26 #1

Other Certificate of Good Standing

#26

(#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britney Anne Heath McDonald ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3860453.) by Westley Gonce. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#25

(#25) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Westley Gonce (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#24

(#24) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America of Service of the ERISA Record (Booker, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#23

(#23) ORDER: Therefore, if counsel has not moved for admission pro hac vice and otherwise complied with LR 83.5(b) on or before Friday, January 11, 2019, Attorney Hern shall be removed as counsel of record herein and will be prohibited from practicing in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/03/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to J. Brooke Hern) (CAT) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

#22

(#22) ORDER: Counsel for the Defendant, Robert T. Szyba, has filed a notice of withdrawal from representation of Defendant [Doc. 21]. Because the Defendant is represented by another attorney of record, the Court finds withdrawal is appropriate pursuant to Local Rule 83.4(f). Mr. Szyba is deemed withdrawn from this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/02/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert T. Szyba) (CAT) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

#21

(#21) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal of Robert T. Szyba as Counsel for Defendant Prudential Attorney Robert T. Szyba terminated. (Booker, Cyrus) (Entered: 12/29/2018)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(SZYBA, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

3 #4

Certificate of Service

3 #3

Text of Proposed Order

3 #2

Declaration of Meredith Formon

3 #1

Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue

#3

(#7) BRIEF in Opposition filed by WESTLEY GONCE re #3 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(HERN, J.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Shea Smith* (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8705984), filed by GONCE WESTLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERN, J.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) ORDER granting #26 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. You MUST register as a CM/ECF user here: #http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/attorney-ecf-registration-form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/14/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Britney Anne Heath McDonald) (AMP) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Verification of PHV Requirements is complete regarding document: #26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britney Anne Heath McDonald ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3860453.) filed by Westley Gonce . (AMP) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney J. Brooke Hern terminated. (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Britney Anne Heath McDonald ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3860453.) by Westley Gonce. (Attachments: #1 Other Certificate of Good Standing)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Westley Gonce (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • NOTICE OF FAILURE TO FILE Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Judge as required by prior court order (CAT) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE by The Prudential Insurance Company of America of Service of the ERISA Record (Booker, Cyrus) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDER: Therefore, if counsel has not moved for admission pro hac vice and otherwise complied with LR 83.5(b) on or before Friday, January 11, 2019, Attorney Hern shall be removed as counsel of record herein and will be prohibited from practicing in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/03/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to J. Brooke Hern) (CAT) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: Counsel for the Defendant, Robert T. Szyba, has filed a notice of withdrawal from representation of Defendant [Doc. 21]. Because the Defendant is represented by another attorney of record, the Court finds withdrawal is appropriate pursuant to Local Rule 83.4(f). Mr. Szyba is deemed withdrawn from this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker on 01/02/2019. (Copy of Order mailed to Robert T. Szyba) (CAT) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal of Robert T. Szyba as Counsel for Defendant Prudential Attorney Robert T. Szyba terminated. (Booker, Cyrus) (Entered: 12/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) BRIEF in Opposition filed by WESTLEY GONCE re #3 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(HERN, J.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Notice of Judicial Preferences. #Click here for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER: The Court will hold an initial conference (rule 16) before U.S.M.J. C. Waldor in courtroom 4C on 8/22/18 at 11:30 AM. Local counsel must be present. Parties are to submit a completed Pretrial Scheduling Order found in the Notice of Judicial Preferences link to chambers via email at CLW_Orders@njd.uscourts.gov no later than 3 days before the scheduled conference. Please contact chambers with any questions or concerns at (973) 776 7862. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 7/11/18. (tjg, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #3 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue. Motion set for 8/6/2018 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA identifying Prudential Financial, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SZYBA, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA.(SZYBA, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue by THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration of Meredith Formon, #3 Text of Proposed Order, #4 Certificate of Service)(SZYBA, ROBERT) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Shea Smith* (sms) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • Case Assigned to Judge Katharine S. Hayden and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (ak, ) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against THE PRUDENTIAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-8705984), filed by GONCE WESTLEY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(HERN, J.) [Transferred from New Jersey on 11/19/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.