This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:03:16 (UTC).

Goldman #542675 v. Bridenstein

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 Goldman 542675 filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against Bridenstein. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gordon J. Quist and Timothy P. Greeley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00143

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gordon J. Quist

Referral Judge

Timothy P. Greeley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lance Adam Goldman #542675

Baraga, MI 49908-9204

Defendant

Paul J. Bridenstein

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION for order named as, "Motion for Immediate Consideration" by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

2 #1

Financial Documents

#2

(#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

1 #1

Exhibits A - B Ninth Judicial Circuit Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for writ of mandamus by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B Ninth Judicial Circuit Court Documents and Court of Appeals, State of Michigan) (mlc) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed IFP - Without Payment of Initial Fee - Prisoner, #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Lance Adam Goldman (mlc) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS and FOR PAYMENT OF FILING FEE: plaintiff may proceed in forma pauperis without payment of an initial partial filing fee; plaintiff to remain liable for the filing fee as funds become available ; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, cam) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for order named as, "Motion for Immediate Consideration" by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (Attachments: #1 Financial Documents) (mlc) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for writ of mandamus by plaintiff Lance Adam Goldman #542675; (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A - B Ninth Judicial Circuit Court Documents and Court of Appeals, State of Michigan) (mlc) Modified text on 8/27/2018 (mlc). (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less