This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 16:22:48 (UTC).

Golden Ring International, Inc. et al v. Cullen et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2018 Golden Ring International, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Cullen. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are David N. Hurd and Andrew T. Baxter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-01244

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David N. Hurd

Referral Judge

Andrew T. Baxter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Trademit Limited

Golden Ring International, Inc.

Living the Dream Films, Inc.

Blazepoint Limited

Defendants

Matthew Cullen

Motion Theory, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Raymond J. Markovich

Attorney at Office of Raymond J. Markovich

351 Westbourne Drive

West Hollywood, CA 90048

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew J Busch

Attorney at Venable LLP - CA Office

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Alex M Weingarten

Attorney at Venable LLP - CA Office

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jeffrey K Logan

Attorney at Venable LLP - CA Office

2049 Century Park East, Suite 2300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Jessie F. Beeber

Attorney at Venable LLP - NY Office

1270 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10020

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). [A copy of this report was mailed to the Register of Copyrights via regular mail on 8/27/2019.] (hmr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

25 #21

Exhibit(s) 5

25 #10

Exhibit(s) 8

25 #9

Exhibit(s) 7

25 #8

Exhibit(s) 6

25 #4

Exhibit(s) 2

25 #3

Exhibit(s) 1

25 #2

Declaration of Mathew Cullen

25 #1

Memorandum of Law

2 #1

Summons for Motion Theory, Inc.

#2

(#2) Summonses Issued as to Matthew Cullen and Motion Theory, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Motion Theory, Inc.)(see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit(s) E

1 #4

Exhibit(s) D

1 #3

Exhibit(s) C

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; TRADE LIBEL; INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT AND REASONABLE ECONOMIC EXPECTANCY with Jury Demand against Matthew Cullen, Motion Theory, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4542069) filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

107 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). [A copy of this report was mailed to the Register of Copyrights via regular mail on 8/27/2019.] (hmr) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) JUDGMENT: It is Ordered and Adjudged: that Defendants Dkt. No. #25 Motion to Dismiss is Granted and that the Dkt. No. #5 Amended Complaint is Dismissed Without Prejudice. All pursuant to the Dkt. No. #34 Memorandum-Decision and Order of U.S. District Court Judge David N. Hurd dated August 26, 2019. (hmr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) MEMORANDUM-DECISION and ORDER: that Defendants' Dkt. No. #25 motion to dismiss is Granted; and that the amended complaint is Dismissed Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge David N. Hurd on 08/26/2019. (hmr) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) TEXT NOTICE ON DISPOSITIVE MOTION - TAKEN ON SUBMIT: Pursuant to the verbal Order of the Hon. David N. Hurd, USDJ RE: #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction . All necessary papers having been received by the Court, this motion returnable on April 12, 2019, is hereby taken ON SUBMITTED PAPERS ONLY. No appearances by either party required or allowed. Written opinion to follow. (ptm) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) REPLY to Response to Motion re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Matthew Cullen, Motion Theory, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Mathew Cullen, #2 Declaration Supplemental Declaration of Jeffrey Logan, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #12 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #13 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 11 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #14 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 12 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #15 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 13 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #16 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 14 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #17 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 15 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #18 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 16 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan, #19 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 17 to Decl of Jeffrey Logan)(Logan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM OF LAW re #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,, #30 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, #29 Memorandum of Law Corrected filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affirmation Raymond J. Markovich, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Exhibit(s) 5, #7 Exhibit(s) 6, #8 Exhibit(s) 7, #9 Exhibit(s) 8, #10 Exhibit(s) 9, #11 Exhibit(s) 10)(Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #25 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6, #7 Exhibit(s) 7, #8 Exhibit(s) 8, #9 Exhibit(s) 9, #10 Exhibit(s) 10)(Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 03/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition to #25 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Personal Jurisdiction,, filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 03/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of Appearance by Alex M Weingarten on behalf of All Defendants (Weingarten, Alex) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey K Logan on behalf of All Defendants (Logan, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER: granting #8 Letter Request. The Court hereby orders the Plaintiffs to serve process and all other documents, required by Section 1702(a) of the California Corporations Code pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(h)(1)(A) and 4(e)(1), upon Defendant Motion Theory, Inc. by delivering, within 30 days from the date of this order, by hand to the California Secretary of State, or to any person employed in the California Secretary of State's office in the capacity of assistant or deputy. Plaintiff is also directed to serve the process and required documents, as well as a copy of this order, on Motion Theory, Inc., c/o Matthew Cullen, Secretary, by certified and regular mail. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter on 12/13/2018. (nmk) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Letter Motion by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited requesting a an order to serve process upon defendant Motion Theroy, Inc. by substitute service of process. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. 1 - True and correct copies the business entity details for Motion Theory, Inc. from the California Secretary of State., #2 Affidavit Ex. 2 - True and correct copy of an Affidavit of Non-Service on Motion Theory, Inc., #3 Proposed Order/Judgment Ex. 3 - Order [Proposed])(Markovich, Raymond) Modified on 12/13/2018 to clarify docket text and remove response deadline. (nmk) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • ***Answer due date updated for Matthew Cullen answer due 12/26/2018. (see) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service (Corrected) of Summons, First Amended Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice, General Order #25, Ci~il Case Management Plan, Filing Order, Case Assignment Form, Notice, and Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge served on Matthew Cullen on 12/03/2018, filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons; First Amended Complaint; Notice; Civil Case Cover Sheet served on Matthew Cullen on 12/03/2018, filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Ex. A - Director Agreement, #2 Exhibit(s) Ex. B - Inducement Letter, #3 Exhibit(s) Ex. C - Cullen et al. v. Hanley et al., No. BC 594640, #4 Exhibit(s) Ex. D - Cross Complaint filed in the Cullen Action by NSL on November 17, 2015, #5 Exhibit(s) Ex. E - Copyright Application)(Markovich, Raymond) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 at 10:30 AM, by telephone unless the parties are specifically directed to appear, before US Magistrate Judge Andrew T. Baxter. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 1/15/2019. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on the Filing and Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright(s). {Report mailed to Register of Copyrights on 10/23/2018} (see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summonses Issued as to Matthew Cullen and Motion Theory, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Motion Theory, Inc.)(see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF; TRADE LIBEL; INTERFERENCE WITH CONTRACT AND REASONABLE ECONOMIC EXPECTANCY with Jury Demand against Matthew Cullen, Motion Theory, Inc. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4542069) filed by Golden Ring International, Inc., Living the Dream Films, Inc., Trademit Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Motion Theory Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Golden Spring (New York) Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew J Busch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessie F Beeber(Designation Retained)