1:17-CV-01003
07/24/2017
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Trademark
Delaware District
GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.
BHSG & CO.
HINA GONDAL
BILAL GONDAL
(#27) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/28/2017. (ceg) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
*Restricted*
(#26) Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:17-cv-02037. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 07/24/2017)
(#25) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a). THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE ACTION HERE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AS CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/30/17. 6/30/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)
(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/29/2017)
(#23) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL MAKE A SUBMISSION TO THE COURT NO LATER THAN 6/30/17, TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE COURT SHALL NOT TRANSFER THE ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/28/17. 6/28/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)
(#22) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL.(COVAL, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)
(#21) Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting with Certificate of Service by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 6/27/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/26/2017)
Exhibit C to Declaration of Robert Scopinich
Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on BHSG & Co. by service on Bilal Gondal as Registered Agent (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on Bilal Gondal (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on Hina Gondal (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GALLUCCI, JR on behalf of GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. (GALLUCCI, RICHARD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/05/2017)
(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CORPORATION for GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.(jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
Exhibit pt 2
Exhibit pt 1
(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE159093), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.(jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2017: #1 Exhibit pt 1, #2 Exhibit pt 2) (jmv, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
(#27) Local Counsel Letter sent. Notice of Compliance deadline set for 8/28/2017. (ceg) (Entered: 07/24/2017)
[-] Read Less(#26) Record of case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number in Other District: 2:17-cv-02037. Copy of Docket Sheet and original file (Entered: 07/24/2017)
[-] Read Less(#25) ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO TRANSFER THE MATTER TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 (a). THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO MARK THE ACTION HERE IN THE EASTERN DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA AS CLOSED; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/30/17. 6/30/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/30/2017)
[-] Read Less(#24) RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/29/2017)
[-] Read Less(#23) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS SHALL MAKE A SUBMISSION TO THE COURT NO LATER THAN 6/30/17, TO SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE COURT SHALL NOT TRANSFER THE ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF DELAWARE; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 6/28/17. 6/28/17 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)
[-] Read Less(#22) Disclosure with Certificate of Service by BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL.(COVAL, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/28/2017)
[-] Read Less(#21) Report of Rule 26(f) Meeting with Certificate of Service by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 6/27/2017 (fb). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/26/2017)
[-] Read Less(#20) RESPONSE in Support re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Scopinich in Support of Reply, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert Scopinich, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert Scopinich, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Robert Scopinich)(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/23/2017)
[-] Read Less(#19) MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..Memorandum in Support; Certificate of Service.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/21/2017)
[-] Read Less(#18) Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief filed by BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit w Exh 1 and 2, #2 Affidavit Affidavit Exh 3 thru 8)(COVAL, CHRISTOPHER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 06/15/2017)
[-] Read Less(#9) MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order As To Expedited Discovery, #2 Certificate of Service)(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/22/2017)
[-] Read Less(#8) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Other Relief filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order To Show Cause, #2 Memorandum In Support, #3 Declaration of Robert Scopinich, #4 Declaration of Amy L. Livingston, #5 Text of Proposed Order, #6 Certificate of Service)(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/22/2017)
[-] Read Less(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of John M. Doroghazi filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC... (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application, #2 Exhibit Sponsor's Statement and Certificate of Service, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 5/25/2017 (jaa, ). (*FILING FEE PAID: 5/25/17). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/22/2017)
[-] Read Less(#6) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on BHSG & Co. by service on Bilal Gondal as Registered Agent (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
[-] Read Less(#5) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on Bilal Gondal (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
[-] Read Less(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. Return of Service of Summons, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Verified Complaint and Exhibits on Hina Gondal (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/15/2017)
[-] Read Less(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by RICHARD D. GALLUCCI, JR on behalf of GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. (GALLUCCI, RICHARD) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/05/2017)
[-] Read Less(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CORPORATION for GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.(jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
[-] Read LessSummons Issued as to BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL. Forwarded To: 3 Origs given to counsel on 5/3/17 (jmv, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
[-] Read Less(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against BHSG & CO., BILAL GONDAL, HINA GONDAL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE159093), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.(jmv, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/4/2017: #1 Exhibit pt 1, #2 Exhibit pt 2) (jmv, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 7/24/2017.] (Entered: 05/04/2017)
[-] Read Less