This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/24/2018 at 09:10:04 (UTC).

GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. v. GOMBAR et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2017 GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against GOMBAR. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-05068

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants

LAAVANYA GOMBAR

LEA BLAZEY GOMBAR

OUR FUTURE'S EDUCATION LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANTINE THOMAS FOURNARIS

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Our Future's Education, LLC by upon Lea Blazey Gombar, as registered agent on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Laavanya Gombar by Personal service on Laavanya Gombar on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Lea Blazey Gombar by Personal service upon Lea Blazey Gombar on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against LAAVANYA GOMBAR, LEA BLAZEY GOMBAR, OUR FUTURE'S EDUCATION LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 168787.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(rt) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Our Future's Education, LLC by upon Lea Blazey Gombar, as registered agent on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Laavanya Gombar by Personal service on Laavanya Gombar on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Elbert Lawrence re: served Verified Complaint and Summons Return of Service upon Lea Blazey Gombar by Personal service upon Lea Blazey Gombar on 11/14/2017 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 11/21/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • Summons Issued as to LAAVANYA GOMBAR, LEA BLAZEY GOMBAR, OUR FUTURE'S EDUCATION LLC. Three Given To: Counsel on November 13, 2017 (rt) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LAAVANYA GOMBAR, LEA BLAZEY GOMBAR, OUR FUTURE'S EDUCATION LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 168787.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(rt) (Entered: 11/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less