This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2018 at 07:04:13 (UTC).

GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. v. ADETUTU et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against ADETUTU. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is CYNTHIA M. RUFE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00042

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.

Defendants

TAIWO ADETUTU

DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC

OLUBUNMI ADETUTU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CONSTANTINE THOMAS FOURNARIS

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Request for Default by Plaintiff GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. against All Defendants. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#6

(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Olubunmi Adetutu on behalf of DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon TAIWO ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#4

(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon OLUBUNMI ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#3

(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Taiwu Adetutu by Personal Service on January 20, 2018 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY WITH WRONG PDF. REFILED BY ATTY AT ENTRY #5 .) (va, ). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171363.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2018: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (rt, ). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • Default Entered (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DEFAULT BY OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Default by Plaintiff GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. against All Defendants. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Olubunmi Adetutu on behalf of DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon TAIWO ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon OLUBUNMI ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Taiwu Adetutu by Personal Service on January 20, 2018 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY WITH WRONG PDF. REFILED BY ATTY AT ENTRY #5 .) (va, ). (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • Summons Issued as to OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC. Three Given to Counsel on January 8, 2018 (rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171363.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2018: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (rt, ). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less