2:18-CV-00042
01/08/2018
Pending - Other Pending
Intellectual Property - Trademark
Pennsylvania Eastern District
CYNTHIA M. RUFE
GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC.
TAIWO ADETUTU
DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC
OLUBUNMI ADETUTU
CONSTANTINE THOMAS FOURNARIS
Attorney at WIGGIN AND DANA LLP
Two Liberty Place, 50 S. 16Th St. Ste 2925
Philadelphia, PA 19102
(#7) Request for Default by Plaintiff GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. against All Defendants. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Olubunmi Adetutu on behalf of DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon TAIWO ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon OLUBUNMI ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Taiwu Adetutu by Personal Service on January 20, 2018 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY WITH WRONG PDF. REFILED BY ATTY AT ENTRY #5 .) (va, ). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
Exhibit
Exhibit
Exhibit
(#1) COMPLAINT against OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171363.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2018: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (rt, ). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
Default Entered (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
[-] Read LessDEFAULT BY OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (va, ) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
[-] Read Less(#7) Request for Default by Plaintiff GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC. against All Defendants. (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (Entered: 02/13/2018)
[-] Read Less(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Olubunmi Adetutu on behalf of DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
[-] Read Less(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon TAIWO ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
[-] Read Less(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon OLUBUNMI ADETUTU by Personal Service on 1/20/2018, answer due 2/12/2018.(FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) Modified on 1/24/2018 (md). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
[-] Read Less(#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Sheral Johnson re: served Summons; Corporate Disclosure Statement; Verified Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet; Case Management Track Designation Form upon Taiwu Adetutu by Personal Service on January 20, 2018 (FOURNARIS, CONSTANTINE) (FILED IN ERROR BY ATTY WITH WRONG PDF. REFILED BY ATTY AT ENTRY #5 .) (va, ). (Entered: 01/23/2018)
[-] Read Less(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
[-] Read LessSummons Issued as to OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC. Three Given to Counsel on January 8, 2018 (rt) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
[-] Read Less(#1) COMPLAINT against OLUBUNMI ADETUTU, TAIWO ADETUTU, DABTKE CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND ENRICHMENT CENTERS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 171363.), filed by GODDARD SYSTEMS, INC..(rt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2018: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (rt, ). (Entered: 01/09/2018)
[-] Read Less