This case was last updated from PACER on 10/01/2018 at 08:05:00 (UTC).

Global Interactive Media, Inc. v. Titan TV, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2018 Global Interactive Media, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Titan TV, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are William M. Conley and Stephen L. Crocker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00597

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William M. Conley

Referral Judge

Stephen L. Crocker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Global Interactive Media, Inc.

Defendants

Titan TV, Inc.

Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brian S. Seal

Attorney at Butzel Long, PC

1909 K. St., Nw,, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Thomas Garner Southard

Attorney at Butzel Long, PC

1909 K. St., N.W., Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Defendant Attorney

Gregory Loyde Hillyer

Attorney at Hillyer Legal, PLLC

5335 Wisconsin Ave, Nw, Suite 440

Washington, DC 20015

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Disregard. See 16.

#15

(#15) MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/5/2018. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Disregard. See #16 .) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#16

(#16) Declaration of Christopher Kelly filed by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. re: #15 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions - Corporate Records, Titan TV, Inc.) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/17/2018. (arw) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

16 #1

Exhibit 1

#13

(#13) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hillyer, Gregory) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

13 #1

Text of Proposed Order

3 #1

JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet

3 #2

Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,574,721

3 #5

Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media

3 #4

Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,314,577

3 #7

Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action

3 #6

Summons - TitanTV, Inc.

3 #3

Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,032,907

#3

(#3) PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2291175) filed by Global Interactive Media, Inc. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,574,721, issued 08/11/2009, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 8,032.907, issued 10/04/2011, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 6,314,577, issued 11/06/2001, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,574,721, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,032,907, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,314,577, #5 Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media, #6 Summons - TitanTV, Inc., #7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Southard, Thomas) Modified on 8/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#11

(#11) Motion to Admit Gregory Loyde Hillyer Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2306924.) by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hillyer, Gregory) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#10

(#10) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Titan TV, Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Southard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Seal, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

#8

(#8) Disregard. See #9 . Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Declaration of Christopher Kelly filed by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. re: #15 Motion to Dismiss, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wisconsin Department of Financial Institutions - Corporate Records, Titan TV, Inc.) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/17/2018. (arw) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION TO DISMISS by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Brief in Opposition due 10/5/2018. Brief in Reply due 10/15/2018. (Attachments: #1 Disregard. See #16 .) (Hillyer, Gregory) Modified on 9/19/2018. (lak) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Titan TV, Inc. answer due 9/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker on 8/28/2018. (arw) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #3 Complaint, by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Hillyer, Gregory) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #11 Motion to Admit Gregory Loyde Hillyer Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/27/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion to Admit Gregory Loyde Hillyer Pro Hac Vice. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 100 receipt number 0758-2306924.) by Defendant Titan TV, Inc. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (Hillyer, Gregory) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Affidavit of Service by Plaintiff. Titan TV, Inc. served on 8/10/2018, answer due 8/31/2018. (Southard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Seal, Brian) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Disregard. See #9 . Modified on 8/7/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Report on Filing of Patent or Trademark Action. Copy provided to the US Patent and Trademark Office electronically. (arw) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Titan TV, Inc. and Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media, LLC) (arw) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Standard attachments for District Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service: # NORTC, #Corporate Disclosure Statement. (arw) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case randomly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. (arw) (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #2 Motion to Admit Brian S. Seal Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ** TEXT ONLY ORDER **ORDER granting #1 Motion to Admit Thomas Garner Southard Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter A. Oppeneer on 8/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PATENT COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0758-2291175) filed by Global Interactive Media, Inc. PATENTS AT ISSUE: Patent # 7,574,721, issued 08/11/2009, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 8,032.907, issued 10/04/2011, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc.; Patent # 6,314,577, issued 11/06/2001, held by Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Attachments: #1 JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,574,721, #3 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,032,907, #4 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 6,314,577, #5 Summons - Broadcast Interactive Media, #6 Summons - TitanTV, Inc., #7 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark Action) (Southard, Thomas) Modified on 8/3/2018. (lak) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion to Admit Brian S. Seal Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice fee $100, receipt number 0758-2291174) by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Seal, Brian) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Motion to Admit Thomas Garner Southard Pro Hac Vice (Pro Hac Vice fee $100, receipt number 0758-2291165) by Plaintiff Global Interactive Media, Inc. (Southard, Thomas) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.