This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/14/2020 at 16:11:57 (UTC).

Global Force Entertainment, Inc. et al v. Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2018 Global Force Entertainment, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Anthem Sports Entertainment Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr, Joe Brown and Barbara D. Holmes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00749

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr

Referral Judges

Joe Brown

Barbara D. Holmes

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Jeffrey Jarrett

Global Force Entertainment, Inc.

Defendants and Counter Plaintiffs

Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp.

Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas R. Valenti

Attorney at Miller Legal Partners PLLC

Suite 2000, 424 Church Street

Nashville, TN 37219

A. Grace Van Dyke James

Attorney at Breeding Henry Baysan PC

Suite 2000, 424 Church Street

Nashville, TN 37219

Samuel F. Miller

Attorney at Miller Legal Partners PLLC

Suite 2000, 424 Church Street

Nashville, TN 37219

Sara R. Ellis

Attorney at Miller Legal Partners PLLC

424 Church St., Suite 2000

Nashville, TN 37219

Hayley H. Baker

Attorney at Miller Legal Partners PLLC

214 Overlook Circle, Suite 275

Brentwood, TN 37027

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

Paige Waldrop Mills

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims (Nashville Office)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Ashleigh D. Karnell

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims (Nashville Office)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

Ryan Allan Lee

Attorney at Bass, Berry & Sims (Nashville Office)

150 Third Avenue South, Suite 2800

Nashville, TN 37201

 

Court Documents

#278

(#278) ORDER: Plaintiffs Global Force Entertainment, Inc. and Jeffrey Jarrett have filed an Unopposed Motion to Set a Date for Re-Trial (Doc. No. #277 ). The request to reset the trial is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As for the settlement conference, Kevin H. Sharp, a former Judge of this Court, is available and willing to serve as a private mediator. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall contact Kevin Sharp and arrange for private mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/8/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

#277

(#277) MOTION Set A Date For Re-Trial by Global Force Entertainment, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#276

(#276) NOTICE by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. OF WITHDRAWAL BY SARA ELLIS (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#275

(#275) ORDER: Plaintiffs have now filed a Motion to Ascertain Status #274 , which is GRANTED. Unfortunately, the Court no longer has the resources to conduct a judicial settlement conference. Accordingly, in place of the anticipated judicial settlement conference, the parties are directed to engage a private mediator at their earliest convenience, and make a further good-faith attempt to resolve their dispute. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

#274

(#274) MOTION to Ascertain Status of re #273 Judicial Settlement Conference by Global Force Entertainment, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#273

(#273) ORDER: For the reasons discussed during the telephone conference on September 4, 2020, the judicial settlement conference scheduled for September 10, 2020 is hereby CANCELLED to be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#272

(#272) ORDER: The Judicial Settlement Conference set for September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to September 10, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., before District Judge Travis McDonough, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/2020. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#271

(#271) ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record, the Motion for a Judicial Settlement Conference (Doc. No. #267 ) is GRANTED, and a Judicial Settlement Conference will be held before Judge Travis McDonough on September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. in Nashville, Tennessee. All counsel, Mr. Jeffrey Jarrett, and Mr. Ed Nordholm shall attend the judicial settlement conference. Prior to the conference, Judge McDonough will hold a Zoom conference and at that time set a deadline for filing position statements. Additionally, Judge Travis McDonough will talk to mediator Alex Fardon prior to the settlement conference and Mr. Miller and Ms. Mills shall jointly notify Mr. Fardon. The status conference scheduled for September 11, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/13/2020. (vh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#267

(#271) ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record, the Motion for a Judicial Settlement Conference (Doc. No. #267 ) is GRANTED, and a Judicial Settlement Conference will be held before Judge Travis McDonough on September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. in Nashville, Tennessee. All counsel, Mr. Jeffrey Jarrett, and Mr. Ed Nordholm shall attend the judicial settlement conference. Prior to the conference, Judge McDonough will hold a Zoom conference and at that time set a deadline for filing position statements. Additionally, Judge Travis McDonough will talk to mediator Alex Fardon prior to the settlement conference and Mr. Miller and Ms. Mills shall jointly notify Mr. Fardon. The status conference scheduled for September 11, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/13/2020. (vh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#3

(#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jeffrey Jarrett. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

#2

(#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

1 #4

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit 5 - GWN Screen Capture

1 #2

Exhibit 4 - Impact! Screen Capture

1 #1

Exhibit 3 - Fight Network Screen Capture

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp., Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2728477), filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc., Jeffrey Jarrett. Summons not provided. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Fight Network Screen Capture, #2 Exhibit 4 - Impact! Screen Capture, #3 Exhibit 5 - GWN Screen Capture, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

515 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#278) ORDER: Plaintiffs Global Force Entertainment, Inc. and Jeffrey Jarrett have filed an Unopposed Motion to Set a Date for Re-Trial (Doc. No. #277 ). The request to reset the trial is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. As for the settlement conference, Kevin H. Sharp, a former Judge of this Court, is available and willing to serve as a private mediator. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, the parties shall contact Kevin Sharp and arrange for private mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 10/8/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#277) MOTION Set A Date For Re-Trial by Global Force Entertainment, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#276) NOTICE by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. OF WITHDRAWAL BY SARA ELLIS (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#275) ORDER: Plaintiffs have now filed a Motion to Ascertain Status #274 , which is GRANTED. Unfortunately, the Court no longer has the resources to conduct a judicial settlement conference. Accordingly, in place of the anticipated judicial settlement conference, the parties are directed to engage a private mediator at their earliest convenience, and make a further good-faith attempt to resolve their dispute. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/22/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(dt) (Entered: 09/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#274) MOTION to Ascertain Status of re #273 Judicial Settlement Conference by Global Force Entertainment, Inc.. (Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#273) ORDER: For the reasons discussed during the telephone conference on September 4, 2020, the judicial settlement conference scheduled for September 10, 2020 is hereby CANCELLED to be reset at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 9/4/2020. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(hb) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 9/4/2020. The mediation will not be held at this time. (Court Reporter None.)(Hearing lasted :3)(Parise, Kelly) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#272) ORDER: The Judicial Settlement Conference set for September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. is RESCHEDULED to September 10, 2020, at 9:00 a.m., before District Judge Travis McDonough, United States District Court for the Eastern District of Tennessee. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/2020. (mg) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#271) ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record, the Motion for a Judicial Settlement Conference (Doc. No. #267 ) is GRANTED, and a Judicial Settlement Conference will be held before Judge Travis McDonough on September 11, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. in Nashville, Tennessee. All counsel, Mr. Jeffrey Jarrett, and Mr. Ed Nordholm shall attend the judicial settlement conference. Prior to the conference, Judge McDonough will hold a Zoom conference and at that time set a deadline for filing position statements. Additionally, Judge Travis McDonough will talk to mediator Alex Fardon prior to the settlement conference and Mr. Miller and Ms. Mills shall jointly notify Mr. Fardon. The status conference scheduled for September 11, 2020 is CANCELLED. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/13/2020. (vh) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr: Telephone Status Conference held on 8/12/2020. The parties shall attend a Judicial Settlement Conference on September 11, 2020 before Judge Travis McDonough. Judge McDonough shall speak to Mr. Fardon in advance. The parties shall file position statements. (Court Reporter Roxann Harkins.)(Hearing lasted :10)(Parise, Kelly) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
285 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Discovery VERY LIMITED EXPEDITED DISCOVERY, MOTION to Expedite Determination of Motion by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Copyright Office Receipts)(Miller, Samuel) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge Waverly D. Crenshaw, Jr on 8/14/18. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(gb) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons issued as to Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp. and Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 783 before Magistrate Judge Joe Brown. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Samuel F. Miller, Nicholas R. Valenti and A. Grace Van Dyke James. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Jeffrey Jarrett. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) BUSINESS ENTITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc. (gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Anthem Sports & Entertainment Corp., Anthem Wrestling Exhibitions, LLC (Filing fee paid $400, Receipt number 0650-2728477), filed by Global Force Entertainment, Inc., Jeffrey Jarrett. Summons not provided. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - Fight Network Screen Capture, #2 Exhibit 4 - Impact! Screen Capture, #3 Exhibit 5 - GWN Screen Capture, #4 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet)(gb) (Entered: 08/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ashleigh D. Karnell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan Allan Lee