This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2018 at 07:47:03 (UTC).

Gist v. Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Gist filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00221

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeffery Michael Gist

Defendants

Jeff Halfacre

Does II through XX

John Denton

Keylen Reed

Chris Elliot

Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lowell G. Howe

Attorney at Howe Law Firm, PC

Po Box 1972

Muskogee, OK 74402

 

Court Documents

4 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/25/2018 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#2

(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Denton, Does II through XX, Chris Elliot, Jeff Halfacre, Keylen Reed, Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners by Jeffery Michael Gist (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffery Michael Gist (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 10/25/2018 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 10/19/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/23/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1193894 (Re: #2 Complaint ) by Jeffery Michael Gist (Howe, Lowell) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/23/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against John Denton, Does II through XX, Chris Elliot, Jeff Halfacre, Keylen Reed, Wagoner County Board of County Commissioners by Jeffery Michael Gist (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Jeffery Michael Gist (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less