This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2018 at 07:47:10 (UTC).

Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation

Case Summary

On 08/16/2018 Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc filed a Labor - National Labor Relations Act lawsuit against Plumbers Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Aleta A. Trauger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00768

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - National Labor Relations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Aleta A. Trauger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.

Defendants

Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation

U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO)

225 Ben Allen Road

Nashville, TN 37207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Scott A. Frick

Attorney at The Frick Law Firm, PLLC

5521 Murray Avenue, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

Defendant Attorney

Deborah Godwin

Attorney at Godwin, Morris, Laurenzi & Bloomfield, PC

P O Box 3290, 50 N Front Street, Suite 800

Memphis, TN 38173-0290

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER: Given the filing of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 12), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 15, 2018 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/9/2018. (jw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

12 #2

Exhibit A Contract

12 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation, U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Contract)(Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#11

(#11) Summons issued as to U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). Service copies mailed to counsel for service. (jw) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER: The filing of the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 6) renders moot the pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 5). The Motion to Dismiss is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/7/2018. (jw) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#9

(#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #6 Amended Complaint. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#8

(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. re #6 Amended Complaint of Service (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit A - 2013 Working Agreement

#6

(#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2013 Working Agreement)(Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

5 #2

Exhibit A - Certificate and Charter

5 #1

Attachment Memorandum in Support

#5

(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate and Charter)(Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 2:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER: Given the filing of a Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 12), it is hereby ORDERED that the initial case management conference scheduled for October 15, 2018 is CONTINUED, to be reset, if appropriate, following disposition of this motion. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 10/9/2018. (jw) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim of Amended Complaint by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation, U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A Contract)(Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons issued as to U.A. Local 572 of the United Association of Journeymen and Apprentices of the Plumbing and Pipefitters Industry of the United States and Canada (AFL-CIO). Service copies mailed to counsel for service. (jw) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER: The filing of the Amended Complaint (Docket No. 6) renders moot the pending Motion to Dismiss (Docket No. 5). The Motion to Dismiss is therefore DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 9/7/2018. (jw) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #6 Amended Complaint. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc. re #6 Amended Complaint of Service (Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants, filed by Gipson Mechanical Contractors, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2013 Working Agreement)(Frick, Scott) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate and Charter)(Godwin, Deborah) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/15/2018 at 2:45 PM in Chambers 825 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • TN State Bar status verified as active for Scott A. Frick, and Deborah Godwin. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plumbers & Pipefitters Local 572 Building Corporation from Circuit Court of Davidson County, Tennessee, case number 18C1854. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0650-2732544) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Complaint for Damages, #3 Exhibit 1 - Circuit Court Summons, #4 Exhibit 2 - Notice to State Court of Removal, #5 Attachment - Notice to Plaintiff and Counsel of Removal)(mg) (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less