This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2019 at 07:35:00 (UTC).

Gill v. Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Gill filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Max O. Cogburn, Jr and David S. Cayer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00681

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Max O. Cogburn, Jr

Referral Judge

David S. Cayer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy S Gill

Charlotte, NC 28214

Defendant

Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill.(jaw) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Miscellaneous Filing of Signature Page by Timothy S Gill. re: #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jaw) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#2

RESTRICTED

#1

(#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jaw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days of service of this Order, file an Amended Complaint as set forth in this Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 01/17/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

1 #1

Summons

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill.(jaw) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Complaint due by 2/6/2019. (brl) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall, within twenty (20) days of service of this Order, file an Amended Complaint as set forth in this Order. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 01/17/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Miscellaneous Filing of Signature Page by Timothy S Gill. re: #2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jaw) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. The document was served conventionally by US Mail (jaw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy S Gill. (jaw) Motions referred to David S. Cayer. (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Pro Se COMPLAINT against Coca Cola Bottling Consolidated Company, filed by Timothy S Gill. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jaw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Added Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer; Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned to case due to conflict. (jaw) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less