This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2018 at 07:35:52 (UTC).

Gilchrist Construction Co L L C v. Travelers Indemnity Co et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2018 Gilchrist Construction Co L L C filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Travelers Indemnity Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-00925

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gilchrist Construction Co L L C

Defendants

T. June Wilder

Juanita Fontenot

Travelers Indemnity Co

Arch Insurance Co

T June Wilder

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William Lee Kohler

Attorney at Gardner & Kewley

110 Veterans Blvd Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70005

Douglas A Kewley

Attorney at Gardner & Kewley

110 Veterans Blvd Ste 300

Metairie, LA 70005

Defendant Attorneys

Michael R Davis

Attorney at Hymel Davis & Petersen

10602 Coursey Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Timothy Paul Hartdegen

Attorney at Hymel Davis & Petersen

10602 Coursey Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Richard A Sherburne, Jr

Attorney at Hymel Davis & Petersen

10602 Coursey Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70816

Seth A Schmeeckle

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tina L Kappen

Attorney at Lugenbuhl Wheaton et al (NO)

601 Poydras St Ste 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Kristen Lewis Hayes

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

Katie Lynn Dysart

Attorney at Baker Donelson et al (NO)

201 St Charles Ave Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#33

#32

#31

25 #6

Exhibit E - 8/1/08-8/1/09 Policy

25 #5

Exhibit D - 8/1/07-8/1/08 Policy

25 #3

Exhibit B - Fontenot/Wilder Jury Verdict Form

19 #2

Exhibit A

19 #1

Memorandum / Brief In Support of Motion to Remand

#19

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil cover sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - Joint State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Complete State Court Record

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Travelers Citation and Petition

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Arch Citation and Petition

#1

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#33) REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Gilchrist Construction Co L L C. (aty,Kohler, William) (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#32) ORDER granting #31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Gilchrist shall have 10 days after this Court rules on the presently pending Motion to Remand #19 to file its memorandum in opposition to the Motion to Dismiss #25 filed by Arch Insurance Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 8/31/2018. (crt,Bunting, M) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #25 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Gilchrist Construction Company, LLC's claims against Arch Insurance Company pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) with consent by Gilchrist Construction Co L L C. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Kohler, William) (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees and Response to Gilchrist's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss #28 filed by Travelers Indemnity Co. (aty,Kappen, Tina) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) or, Alternatively, MOTION to Remand Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 filed by Travelers Indemnity Co. (aty,Kappen, Tina) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) or, Alternatively, MOTION to Remand Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1447 filed by Gilchrist Construction Co L L C. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(aty,Kohler, William) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 12(b)(6) or, Alternatively, MOTION to Remand Under 28 U.S.C. Section 1447, #19 MOTION to Remand MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Arch Insurance Co. (aty,Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Motion Setting regarding: #25 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Gilchrist Construction Company, LLC's claims against Arch Insurance Company pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6). Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,ThomasSld, T) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Claim Gilchrist Construction Company, LLC's claims against Arch Insurance Company pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) by Arch Insurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Fontenot/Wilder Original Petition for Damages, #3 Exhibit B - Fontenot/Wilder Jury Verdict Form, #4 Exhibit C - 8/1/06/8/1/07 Policy, #5 Exhibit D - 8/1/07-8/1/08 Policy, #6 Exhibit E - 8/1/08-8/1/09 Policy)(aty,Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Complaint by Travelers Indemnity Co.(aty,Kappen, Tina) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION FOR EXTENSION of Time to File Responsive Pleadings with consent by Juanita Fontenot, T June Wilder. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hartdegen, Timothy) Modified on 7/23/2018 to change motion event and edit text (Williams, L). (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer with consent by Travelers Indemnity Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order for Extension of Time)(aty,Kappen, Tina) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal with consent by Arch Insurance Co. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(aty,Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 07/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REMOVAL ORDER regarding state court documents, pending motions, registry funds, and admission status of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay on 7/17/2018. (crt,LaCombe, L) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED REMOVAL ORDER referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (Public entry, but no electronic notice). (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Tina L Kappen, Seth A Schmeeckle on behalf of Travelers Indemnity Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/30/2018. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure Statement Requirement re: #1 Notice of Removal, sent to Kristen Lewis Hayes, Katie Lynn Dysart on behalf of Arch Insurance Co. Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 7/30/2018. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • CASE Assigned to Unassigned District Judge and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • STATE COURT Service Returned Executed in the 33rd JDC, Parish of Allen. Arch Insurance Co answer due 7/20/2018; Travelers Indemnity Co answer due 7/20/2018. ADMINISTRATIVE ENTRY: There is no PDF image with this entry. The PDF image can be found in Attachment #2 to Document #1 , Notice of Removal. (crt,Mitchell, Pam) (Entered: 07/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE of Removal from 33rd JDC Allen Parish, Case Number C-2018-191 (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0536-3702233) filed by Arch Insurance Co, Travelers Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Arch Citation and Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Travelers Citation and Petition, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complete State Court Record, #4 Exhibit 4 - Joint State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #5 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney Kristen Lewis Hayes added to party Arch Insurance Co(pty:dft))(aty,Hayes, Kristen) (Entered: 07/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gilchrist is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Travelers Indemnity Company is a litigant