This case was last updated from PACER on 12/13/2018 at 09:39:11 (UTC).

Gibson v. Morris et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Gibson filed a Government Benefit - Medicare lawsuit against Morris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John T. Copenhaver, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01189

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Medicare

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John T. Copenhaver, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Donald Ray Gibson

Defendants

India Morris

Jessica Mae Surface

South Charleston, WV 25309

Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

H. Wyatt Hanna, III

P. O. Box 8070

South Charleston, WV 25303

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew F. Workman

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF W. STEPHEN FLESHER

Bb&T Square, Suite 740, 300 Summers Street

Charleston, WV 25301-1630

William R. Slicer

Attorney at SHUMAN MCCUSKEY & SLICER

P. O. Box 3953

Charleston, WV 25339

Glen A. Murphy

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE

P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

James Simon

Attorney at SPILMAN THOMAS & BATTLE

P. O. Box 273

Charleston, WV 25321-0273

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Partial Dismissal Order by Jessica Mae Surface, Donald Ray Gibson, India Morris, Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Slicer, William) (Modified on 9/5/2018 to add party filers) (kp).

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #1

Exhibit A

#4

(#4) STIPULATION Coventry Health Care of West Virginia, Inc. has until 9/28/2018, to answer, move, or otherwise file a responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., Donald Ray Gibson. (Murphy, Glen) (Modified on 7/31/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kp).

#5

(#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/17/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/24/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 9/28/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/8/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#8

(#8) VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL ORDER Directing that Plaintiff's and co-defendant India Morris claims against defendant Jessica Mae Surface are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own respective costs, legal fees, and expenses; to the extent that Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. could ever have a claim against Jessica Mae Surface arising out of the subject matter of this lawsuit, this suit is dismissed against Jessica Mae Surface without prejudice as to Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., only; this matter will remain in litigation as to plaintiff's claims against defendants India Morris and Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

#6

(#6) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/28/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/10/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/17/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 10/26/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/5/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6667150. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Murphy, Glen)

1 #5

Exhibit E

#2

(#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) VOLUNTARY PARTIAL DISMISSAL ORDER Directing that Plaintiff's and co-defendant India Morris claims against defendant Jessica Mae Surface are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to pay their own respective costs, legal fees, and expenses; to the extent that Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. could ever have a claim against Jessica Mae Surface arising out of the subject matter of this lawsuit, this suit is dismissed against Jessica Mae Surface without prejudice as to Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., only; this matter will remain in litigation as to plaintiff's claims against defendants India Morris and Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 9/6/2018. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (tmr)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PROPOSED ORDER Voluntary Partial Dismissal Order by Jessica Mae Surface, Donald Ray Gibson, India Morris, Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Slicer, William) (Modified on 9/5/2018 to add party filers) (kp).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/28/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/10/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 10/17/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 10/26/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 11/5/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 11/12/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER AND NOTICE: Rule 12(b) Motions 9/5/2018. Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/17/2018. Last day to file report of Rule 26(f) Meeting 9/24/2018. Scheduling Conference at 9:30 a.m. on 9/28/2018 in Charleston. Entry of Scheduling Order 10/8/2018. Last Day to make Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures 10/15/2018. Signed by Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. on 8/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented parties) (taq)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • SET ANSWER DEADLINE for Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. to 9/28/2018. (kp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION Coventry Health Care of West Virginia, Inc. has until 9/28/2018, to answer, move, or otherwise file a responsive pleading to the Complaint Attached to #1 Notice of Removal by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc., Donald Ray Gibson. (Murphy, Glen) (Modified on 7/31/2018 to add link to #1 notice of removal and to add party filer) (kp).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO RULE 7.1, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, by Defendant Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. (Murphy, Glen)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED JANUARY 4, 2016. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Tinsley. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (taq)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • CASE assigned to Judge John T. Copenhaver, Jr. (klc) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Coventry Healthcare of West Virginia, Inc. with summons, complaint and docket sheet from Circuit Court of Kanawha County. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt #AWVSDC-6667150. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (taq) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.