This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/20/2018 at 05:45:09 (UTC).

Gibbs et al v. Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/19/2018 Gibbs filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Ed Kinkeade and Rebecca Rutherford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00988

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ed Kinkeade

Referral Judge

Rebecca Rutherford

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darlene Gibbs

Patrick Inscho

Stephanie Edwards

Lawrence Mwethuku

Lula Williams

Defendants

Scott Zemnick

Thomas Welch

Victory Park Capital Advisors LLC

Jeffrey Schneider

Victory Park Management, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Kristi Cahoon Kelly

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Andrew Joseph Guzzo

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Casey Shannon Nash

Attorney at Kelly & Crandall PLC

3925 Chain Bridge Rd, Suite 202

Fairfax, VA 22030

Craig Carley Marchiando

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Elizabeth W. Hanes

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

James Wilson Speer

Attorney at Virginia Proverty Law Center

919 E Main Street, Suite 610

Richmond, VA 23219

Leonard Anthony Bennett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates

763 J Clyde Morris Boulevard, Suite 1A

Newport News, VA 23601

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Partin Peterson

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Aaron Harvey Marks

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NY-NA)

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

Bryan Alan Fratkin

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP (Richmond)

800 East Canal Street

Richmond, VA 23219

Ross Lee Weiner

Attorney at Kirkland & Ellis LLP (NY-NA)

601 Lexington Ave

New York, NY 10022

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

27 #1

*Restricted*

#27

(#27) Case electronically transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00048. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#26

(#26) ORDER that the Court transfers all claims asserted against Defendants Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Scott Zemnick, Jeffrey Schneider, and Thomas Welch to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, where related chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings are currently pending. This action shall remain open and continue as to Defendants Haynes Investments, LLC, Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC, and L. Stephen Haynes. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/19/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)

25 #1

Exhibit 1

#25

(#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Jeffrey Schneider, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Thomas Welch, Scott Zemnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

24 #1

Exhibit 1

#24

(#24) MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412 by Jeffrey Schneider, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Thomas Welch, Scott Zemnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

#18

(#23) ORDERS granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice, #18 Motion for Pro hac vice, and #19 Motion for Pro hac vice. David Foster Herman, Richard Lawrence Scheff, and Jonathan Peter Boughrum appointed for L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC, and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/18/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

1 #20

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #17

Exhibit 17

1 #16

Exhibit 16

1 #15

Exhibit 15

1 #14

Exhibit 14

1 #9

Exhibit 9

1 #8

Exhibit 8

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #3

Exhibit 3

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (rekc) (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) Case electronically transferred in from District of Virginia Eastern; Case Number 3:18-cv-00048. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ORDER that the Court transfers all claims asserted against Defendants Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Scott Zemnick, Jeffrey Schneider, and Thomas Welch to the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of Texas, where related chapter 11 bankruptcy proceedings are currently pending. This action shall remain open and continue as to Defendants Haynes Investments, LLC, Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC, and L. Stephen Haynes. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/19/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Jeffrey Schneider, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Thomas Welch, Scott Zemnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1412 by Jeffrey Schneider, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Thomas Welch, Scott Zemnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) ORDERS granting #17 Motion for Pro hac vice, #18 Motion for Pro hac vice, and #19 Motion for Pro hac vice. David Foster Herman, Richard Lawrence Scheff, and Jonathan Peter Boughrum appointed for L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC, and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/18/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER that this matter comes before the Court on its April 17, 2018 Order granting Defendants L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC, and Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC's (the "Haynes Defendants") Consent Motion for Extension of Time #20 . The Court CLARIFIES that it GRANTS an extension of time to all Haynes Defendants to file their responsive pleadings no later than close of business May 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 04/18/2018. (smej, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER that the Court GRANTS #20 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Haynes and Haynes Investments SHALL file their responsive pleadings no later than close of business May 18, 2018. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 4/17/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC, Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Boughrum and Certification of Local Counsel David N. Anthony Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6039468. by L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC, Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC. (Anthony, David) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Victory Park Management, LLC. (Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC. (Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Jeffrey Schneider, Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC, Victory Park Management, LLC, Thomas Welch, Scott Zemnick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Peterson, Ashley) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER that the Court GRANTS #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Haynes and Haynes Investments SHALL file their responsive pleadings no later than close of business April 19, 2018. Signed by District Judge M. Hannah Lauck on 3/15/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint in Manner Provided by Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by L. Stephen Haynes, Haynes Investments, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Agreed Order)(Moorman, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Haynes Investments, LLC. (Moorman, Robert) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 03/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #3 Certificate of Compliance. Clerk has corrected docket entry to reflect proper answer deadline for Certificate of Compliance. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certificate of Compliance. L. Stephen Haynes served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Haynes Investments, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Jeffrey Schneider served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Sovereign Business Solutions, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Victory Park Management, LLC served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Thomas Welch served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018; Scott Zemnick served on 2/26/2018, answer due 3/19/2018. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 02/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee: $400, receipt number: 0422-5907628) filed by Patrick Inscho, Lawrence Mwethuku, Stephanie Edwards, Lula Williams, and Darlene Gibbs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Civil Cover Sheet) (jsmi, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 4/19/2018.] (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Victory Park Management, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Victory Park Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Wilson Speer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elizabeth W. Hanes